EP2339434 - TOUCH-SENSING PANEL INCLUDING ELECTRODE-INTEGRATED WINDOW, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melfas 913 StarValley 60-11 Gasan-dong Geumcheon-gu Seoul 153-777 / KR | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIN, Dong Jin Daewoo Prugio Apartment 105-604 Sinlim-dong11-dong Kwanak-Gu Seoul 151-772 / KR | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. SA Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/49] | Zardi, Marco M. Zardi & Co. S.A. Via Pioda 6 6900 Lugano / CH | ||
Former [2011/26] | pronovem Meyers & Van Malderen 261, route d'Arlon B.P. 111 8002 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 09810147.0 | 13.08.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009KR04519 | Priority number, date | KR20080083724 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: KR 20080083724 | [2011/26] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010024542 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2339434 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/041, G06F3/044 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/0443 (EP,US);
G06F3/0448 (KR);
G06F3/041 (US);
G06F3/0412 (KR);
G06F3/04164 (KR);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F3/0447 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04103 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T29/49124 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49155 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSSENSITIVE TAFEL MIT ELEKTRODENINTEGRIERTEM FENSTER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/26] | English: | TOUCH-SENSING PANEL INCLUDING ELECTRODE-INTEGRATED WINDOW, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2011/26] | French: | PANNEAU TACTILE COMPRENANT UNE FENÊTRE À ÉLECTRODE INTÉGRÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2011 | Translation filed | 17.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 26.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 28.10.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/12] | 04.11.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2016 | 31.08.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0020917 (MICROTOUCH SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 8,9 * abstract * * page 7, lines 4-9 *; | [A]EP1339082 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 50] , [0051] *; | [A]US2006046078 (RICHTER PAUL J [US], et al) [A] 2-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2007176907 (ISHII RYO [JP]) [A] 16 * abstract ** paragraphs [0006] , [0085] *; | [I]US2007257894 (PHILIPP HARALD [IE]) [I] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0065] , [0 76] - [0081] * | International search | [Y]KR20040017138 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [A]KR100531414B (LG.PHILIPS LCD CO., LTD.); | [Y]KR100640997B (LG.PHILIPS LCD CO., LTD.) | Examination | - M. Hoheisel ET AL, "Microstructure and Etching Properties of Sputtered Indium-Tin Oxide (ITO)", (19910101), URL: http://www.mhoheisel.de/docs/PSSA1231991461.pdf, (20160513), XP055272664 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pssa.2211230211 | - BRIAN G. LEWIS ET AL, "Applications and Processing of Transparent Conducting Oxides", MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY 2000, (20000801), pages 22 - 27, XP055272344 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/mrs2000.147 |