EP2321744 - NEW TAB PAGES AND BOOKMARK TOOLBARS IN A BROWSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODGER, Ben 1983 San Luis Avenue 24 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 02 /
MURPHY, Glen c/o Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | 03 /
RAKOWSKI, Brian 386 Everett Avenue Palo Alto, California 94301 / US | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Round, Edward Mark Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Collins, John David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09810734.5 | 01.09.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009US55616 | Priority number, date | US20080093441P | 01.09.2008 Original published format: US 93441 P | [2011/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010025474 | Date: | 04.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2321744 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 27.10.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2011/20] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06Q50/40 (KR);
G06F16/9574 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | NEUE REGISTERKARTENSEITEN UND LESEZEICHENSYMBOLLEISTEN IN EINEM BROWSER | [2011/20] | English: | NEW TAB PAGES AND BOOKMARK TOOLBARS IN A BROWSER | [2011/20] | French: | NOUVELLES PAGES À ONGLETS ET BARRES D'OUTILS DE SIGNETS DANS UN NAVIGATEUR | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 30.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/49] | 26.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2017 | 05.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6718365 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US]) [X] 1,5,6,10,11 * column 5, line 27 - line 46; figure 7 * * column 7, lines 21-31 *; | [Y]US2006230356 (SAUVE AARON J [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,8* paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0032] , [0035] - [0046] - [0050] - [0053] - [0056] , [0057]; figures 2-10 *; | [XY]US2007162298 (MELTON DON [US], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9-11 * paragraphs [0119] - [0121] - [0129] , [0145] - [0154] - [0160] * [Y] 2,3,7,8; | [X]US2007180381 (RICE STEPHEN J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,10,11 * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0018] - [0026] - [0032] - [0035] - [0045]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [X]US2006230356 (SAUVE AARON J [US], et al); | [A]KR20070043616 (NHN CORP [KR]); | [AP]US2008301562 (BERGER JOSEF [US], et al); | [AP]US2009164922 (PHAKOUSONH OUNEHEUANE [US], et al) |