Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2020283766 | ![]() | 10.09.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US201916276541 | 14.02.2019 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US201514965825 | 10.12.2015 | US202016751026 | 23.01.2020 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201615380571 | 15.12.2016 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019309293 | ![]() | 10.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US201514965825 | 10.12.2015 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US201916276541 | 14.02.2019 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201615380571 | 15.12.2016 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016264963 | ![]() | 15.09.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US201514965825 | 10.12.2015 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9234196 | ![]() | 12.01.2016 | B2 | US2014194493 | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8741866 | ![]() | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2012225927 | 06.09.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8168775 | ![]() | 01.05.2012 | B2 | US2010120893 | 13.05.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12227744 | ![]() | 18.02.2025 | B2 | US2023257740 | 17.08.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117360849 | 28.06.2021 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US201916276541 | 14.02.2019 | US202017102351 | 23.11.2020 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US202117475142 | 14.09.2021 | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US201514965825 | 10.12.2015 | US202117234657 | 19.04.2021 | US202016751026 | 23.01.2020 | US202217721704 | 15.04.2022 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201615380571 | 15.12.2016 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10240152 | ![]() | 26.03.2019 | B2 | US2017321213 | 09.11.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58266909 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US201514965825 | 10.12.2015 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | US201414220829 | 20.03.2014 | US201615380571 | 15.12.2016 | US201213410262 | 01.03.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160079921 | ![]() | 06.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102578331B | ![]() | 15.09.2023 | B1 | KR20220012422 | 03.02.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20197029029 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102354558B | ![]() | 25.01.2022 | B1 | KR20190116553 | 14.10.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | KR20187004090 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102031027B | ![]() | 14.10.2019 | B1 | KR20180017245 | 20.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101635436B | ![]() | 01.07.2016 | B1 | KR20150007359 | 20.01.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101624869B | ![]() | 30.05.2016 | B1 | KR20110073592 | 29.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024116226 | ![]() | 27.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | JP2019125381 | 04.07.2019 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | JP2022106180 | 30.06.2022 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7500658B | ![]() | 17.06.2024 | B2 | JP2022160408 | 19.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | JP2019125381 | 04.07.2019 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5791505B | ![]() | 07.10.2015 | B2 | JP2012506254 | 15.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL310600 | ![]() | 01.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL302142 | ![]() | 01.07.2024 | B2 | IL302142 | 01.03.2024 | B1 | IL302142 | 01.06.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL281434 | ![]() | 01.09.2023 | B2 | IL281434 | 01.05.2023 | B1 | IL281434 | 29.04.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL243178 | ![]() | 25.03.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3848461 | ![]() | 14.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | EP17196203 | 20.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3354733 | ![]() | 09.12.2020 | B1 | EP3354733 | 01.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2937418 | ![]() | 18.10.2017 | B1 | EP2937418 | 28.10.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2739895 | ![]() | 25.09.2018 | C | CA2739895 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2023248138 | ![]() | 09.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017225110 | 08.09.2017 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | AU2023248138 | 12.10.2023 | AU2021203272 | 21.05.2021 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | AU2019216630 | 14.08.2019 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | AU2015249072 | 28.10.2015 | AU2009307677 | 20.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2021203272B | ![]() | 03.08.2023 | B2 | AU2021203272 | 17.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019216630 | 14.08.2019 | AU2017225110 | 08.09.2017 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | AU2021203272 | 21.05.2021 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | AU2015249072 | 28.10.2015 | AU2009307677 | 20.10.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2019216630 | ![]() | 05.09.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2019216630 | 14.08.2019 | AU2017225110 | 08.09.2017 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | AU2015249072 | 28.10.2015 | AU2009307677 | 20.10.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017225110B | ![]() | 16.05.2019 | B2 | AU2017225110 | 28.09.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017225110 | 08.09.2017 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | AU2015249072 | 28.10.2015 | AU2009307677 | 20.10.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2015249072C | ![]() | 27.10.2022 | C1 | AU2015249072B | 14.09.2017 | B2 | AU2015249072 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | AU2015249072 | 28.10.2015 | AU2009307677 | 20.10.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009307677C | ![]() | 22.09.2022 | C1 | AU2009307677B | 30.07.2015 | B2 | AU2009307677 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2344639 | ![]() | 22.04.2015 | B1 | EP2344639 | 20.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0919732 | 08.12.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3018487 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | CA2739895 | 20.10.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3222620 | 29.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA3018487 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102186978B | 12.03.2014 | B | CN102186978 | 14.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103937793B | 11.08.2017 | B | CN103937793 | 23.07.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | CN200980141740 | 20.10.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106834291B | 29.09.2020 | B | CN106834291 | 13.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | CN200980141740 | 20.10.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116944T | 05.04.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120174T | 12.12.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY2019005I | 27.11.2019 | I2 | CY2019005I | 27.11.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2344639T | 27.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2937418T | 22.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA020312 | 30.10.2014 | B1 | EA201170591 | 30.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA202092118 | 30.04.2021 | A3 | EA202092118 | 30.12.2020 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2543004T | 13.08.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1156348 | 08.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150796T | 11.09.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20180093T | 23.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUS1900004I | 28.03.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LTC2937418I | 27.12.2019 | I2 | LTPA2019501I | 25.02.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LUC00098I | 24.12.2019 | I2 | LUC00098I | 31.01.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011004268 | 01.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX344354 | 14.12.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NL300965I | 28.07.2020 | I2 | NL300965I | 06.02.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2019004I | 29.01.2019 | I1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2937418T | 17.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ592867 | 31.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ602404 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | NZ59286709 | 20.10.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ748858 | 31.03.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | NZ73110909 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ797298 | 30.08.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | NZ74885809 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2344639T | 30.10.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2937418T | 30.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2344639T | 30.09.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | EP09810834 | 20.10.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2937418T | 28.02.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201500176B | 07.09.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201800027T | 08.03.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP15151452 | 20.10.2009 | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201102876 | 24.06.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | WO2009US61381 | 20.10.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010048228 | ![]() | 16.09.2010 | A3 | WO2010048228 | 29.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019205442 | ![]() | 05.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6553780B | ![]() | 31.07.2019 | B2 | JP2018171072 | 08.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6371446B | ![]() | 08.08.2018 | B2 | JP2018007666 | 18.01.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015062420 | ![]() | 09.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA029762 | 31.05.2018 | B1 | EA201400170 | 31.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA036772 | 18.12.2020 | B1 | EA201792626 | 31.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2656516T | 27.02.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1216652 | 25.11.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1258859 | 22.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE026604T | 28.06.2016 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037875T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2937418T | 12.02.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2018013398 | 05.01.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX360460 | 05.11.2018 | B | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2344639E | 07.09.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2937418T | 23.01.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201703242X | 29.06.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201809460S | 29.11.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG10201912276X | 27.02.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | US10695608 | 20.10.2008 | US15667009 | 02.03.2009 | US18554509 | 09.06.2009 | US24278309 | 15.09.2009 | US24479409 | 22.09.2009 | US11573808 | 18.11.2008 | Type | ![]() | EP2937418 | EP3354733 |