EP2330458 - ALIGNMENT FILM, ALIGNMENT FILM MATERIAL, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING ALIGNMENT FILM, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Yohei c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | 02 /
MIZUSAKI, Masanobu c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
NAKANISHI, Yohei c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
02 /
MIZUSAKI, Masanobu c/o SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09811251.9 | 28.08.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP04204 | Priority number, date | JP20080225913 | 03.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008225913 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010026721 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330458 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330458 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1337, C08F20/20, C08F20/30, C08F20/58, C08L33/14, C08L33/24, C08L79/08 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
G02F1/133723 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/14 (KR);
C08F222/1006 (KR);
C08F222/102 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/24 (KR);
C08L35/02 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L79/08, C08L2666/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ORIENTIERUNGSFILM, ORIENTIERUNGSFILMMATERIAL, FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG MIT DEM ORIENTIERUNGSFILM UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/23] | English: | ALIGNMENT FILM, ALIGNMENT FILM MATERIAL, LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAY DEVICE COMPRISING ALIGNMENT FILM, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2011/23] | French: | FILM D'ALIGNEMENT, MATIÈRE DE FILM D'ALIGNEMENT, DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE À CRISTAUX LIQUIDES COMPRENANT UN FILM D'ALIGNEMENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | Translation filed | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 10.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2009 | AT | 18.12.2013 | BE | 18.12.2013 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | GB | 28.08.2014 | IE | 28.08.2014 | LU | 28.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | FR | 01.09.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.08.2009 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.08.2009 | |
AT | 18.12.2013 | ||
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 01.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
IE | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
GB | 28.08.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
LU | 28.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 18.12.2013 | |
BE | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003232930 (GIBBONS WAYNE M [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0012] , [0040] , [0041] *; | [Y]EP1498468 (FUJITSU DISPLAY TECH [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] *; | [A]JP2006215184 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2006, no. 64, Database accession no. 2006-615928, XP002680722 & JP2006215184 A 20060817 (JSR CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2006215184 (JSR CORP); | [A]JP2007304509 (JSR CORP) | by applicant | JPH11352486 | JP2006121220 | JP2008225913 |