EP2323351 - MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL THAT DELIVERS VIBRATION INFORMATION, AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Seokkeon 914-224 Gwanaksa Seoul National Univ. Bongcheon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Hyunwook 101-1103 Jeongdeunmaneul Dong-a Apt. Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Namgun 1479-2 Seocho 3-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-073 / KR | [2011/20] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/20] | Barth, Stephan Manuel Reinhard, Skuhra, Weise & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09811689.0 | 02.09.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009KR04938 | Priority number, date | KR20080087644 | 05.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080087644 | KR20080088108 | 08.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080088108 | KR20090020054 | 10.03.2009 Original published format: KR 20090020054 | [2011/20] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010027190 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2323351 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 17.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04B1/40, H04M1/725, G06F3/01, H04N7/15 | [2015/28] | CPC: |
G06F3/016 (EP,US);
H04N7/15 (US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
H04M2250/74 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | H04M1/00, H04B1/40 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/20] | Title | German: | MOBILKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄT ZUR AUSGABE VON VIBRATIONSINFORMATIONEN SOWIE VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/20] | English: | MOBILE COMMUNICATION TERMINAL THAT DELIVERS VIBRATION INFORMATION, AND METHOD THEREOF | [2011/20] | French: | TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION MOBILE FOURNISSANT DES INFORMATIONS DE VIBRATIONS ET PROCEDE ASSOCIE | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2011 | Translation filed | 04.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 13.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2006013363 (VODAFONE PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 7, line 7 - page 13, line 14 *; | [I]WO2007073402 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE], et al) [I] 1-8 * abstract * * page 3, line 8 - page 7, line 18 *; | [A]US2008153554 (YOON SANG HYEON [KR], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0102] - [0132] - [0162] - [0169]; figures 2-5,9 * | International search | [X]JP2005295170 (BROTHER IND LTD); | [A]JP2005332118 (NEC CORP); | [A]KR20060079071 (GIGA BYTE COMM INC [TW], et al); | [A]KR100744902B (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]JP2007312305 (SKY KK) |