EP2331199 - IONTOPHORETIC DRUG DELIVERY PACKAGING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH Schlüsselstrasse 12 8645 Rapperswil-Jona / CH | [2017/20] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Teikoku Pharma USA, Inc. 1718 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | ||
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Travanti Pharma Inc 2520 Pilot Knob Road, Suite 100 Mendota Heights, MN 55120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRINKE, Todd, A. 1511 Pulaski Road Buffalo, MN 55313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
KRINKE, Todd, A. 1511 Pulaski Road Buffalo MN 55313 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2011/24] | Charig, Raymond Julian, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09811833.4 | 03.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009US04969 | Priority number, date | US20080094442P | 05.09.2008 Original published format: US 94442 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010027468 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331199 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, A61N1/32, A61N1/30 | [2016/38] | CPC: |
A61N1/0428 (EP,US);
A61N1/30 (KR,US);
A61N1/303 (US);
A61N1/04 (KR);
A61N1/044 (EP,US);
A61N1/0448 (EP,US);
A61N1/325 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/24] | A61N1/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2011 | BA | 31.03.2011 | RS | 31.03.2011 | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG FÜR IONTOPHORETISCHE WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNG | [2011/24] | English: | IONTOPHORETIC DRUG DELIVERY PACKAGING | [2011/24] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT POUR DÉLIVRANCE DE MÉDICAMENTS IONOPHORÉTIQUES | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 25.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5817044 (EVERS HANS CHRISTER ARVID [SE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [X]US6745071 (ANDERSON CARTER R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005193554 (YOUNG WENDY A [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0012] * | International search | [Y]US5817044 (EVERS HANS CHRISTER ARVID [SE], et al); | [Y]US6745071 (ANDERSON CARTER R [US], et al); | [Y]US2005193554 (YOUNG WENDY A [US], et al) |