Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012023960 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2014 | A3 | WO2012023960 | 23.02.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80661310 | 17.08.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011031285 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58457109 | 08.09.2009 | US65881510 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010033230 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010033230 | 25.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19244708 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010027506 | Global Dossier | 20.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010027506 | 11.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010027505 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2011 | A3 | WO2010027505 | 11.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19145308 | 09.09.2008 | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0046362 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL12835399 | 03.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011045593 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80661310 | 17.08.2010 | US27460809 | 19.08.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010260887 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20782509 | 17.02.2009 | US65881510 | 16.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010087006 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58618509 | 18.09.2009 | US19244708 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8367392 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2013 | B2 | US2010081177 | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19145308 | 09.09.2008 | US58457109 | 08.09.2009 | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8232088 | Global Dossier | 31.07.2012 | B2 | US2010068816 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58455909 | 08.09.2009 | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009215179 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77438804 | 10.02.2004 | US32268609 | 05.02.2009 | US88973701 | 20.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7612255 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2009 | B2 | US2004172678 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77438804 | 10.02.2004 | IL12835399 | 03.02.1999 | US88973701 | 20.07.2001 | IL0000046 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2126300 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | IL12835399 | 03.02.1999 | IL0000046 | 24.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2384366 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2012 | A4 | EP2384366 | 09.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19145308 | 09.09.2008 | WO2009US05067 | 08.09.2009 | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | US27460809 | 19.08.2009 | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | US32268609 | 05.02.2009 | US19244708 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR022496 | 04.09.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IL12835399 | 03.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR073279 | 28.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR073552 | 17.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR075444 | 30.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58457109 | 08.09.2009 | US20782509 | 17.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2009001822 | 29.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2009001823 | 29.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2010000132 | 02.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US58457109 | 08.09.2009 | US20782509 | 17.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20100269 | 30.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20110101 | 12.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010027516 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2010 | A3 | WO2010027516 | 11.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US19145308 | 09.09.2008 | US19116708 | 05.09.2008 | US19116908 | 05.09.2008 | US27460809 | 19.08.2009 | US32268609 | 05.02.2009 | US19244708 | 18.09.2008 |