EP2384366 - TRANSGENICALLY PREVENTING ESTABLISHMENT AND SPREAD OF TRANSGENIC ALGAE IN NATURAL ECOSYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2015 [2015/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gressel, Jonathan 15 Hayarden St 76604 Rehovot / IL | For all designated states Ufaz, Shai Halvine 21 37808 Givat Ada / IL | For all designated states Chen, Ofra Brener 12 76503 Rehovot / IL | For all designated states Eisenstadt, Doron Antvarfen 12 34980 Haifa / IL | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Koppel, Mart Enn KOPPEL patendibüroo OÜ Oja tee 22-2, Tiskre, Harku vald 76916 Harjumaa / EE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Koppel, Mart Enn KOPPEL patendibüroo OÜ Roseni 10-151 10111 Tallinn / EE | Application number, filing date | 09811866.4 | 08.09.2009 | WO2009US05067 | Priority number, date | US20090322686 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: US 322686 | US20080191167P | 05.09.2008 Original published format: US 191167 P | US20080191169P | 05.09.2008 Original published format: US 191169 P | US20080191453P | 09.09.2008 Original published format: US 191453 P | US20080192447P | 18.09.2008 Original published format: US 192447 P | US20090274608P | 19.08.2009 Original published format: US 274608 P | [2011/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010027516 | Date: | 11.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2384366 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/06, C12N15/74, C12N15/82 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
C12N15/74 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/45] | C12P21/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TRANSGENE VERHINDERUNG DER ETABLIERUNG UND VERBREITUNG TRANSGENER ALGEN IN NATÜRLICHEN ÖKOSYSTEMEN | [2011/45] | English: | TRANSGENICALLY PREVENTING ESTABLISHMENT AND SPREAD OF TRANSGENIC ALGAE IN NATURAL ECOSYSTEMS | [2011/45] | French: | PRÉVENTION DE MANIÈRE TRANSGÉNIQUE DE L ÉTABLISSEMENT ET DE LA PROPAGATION D ALGUES TRANSGÉNIQUES DANS DES ÉCOSYSTÈMES NATURELS | [2011/45] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/45] | 22.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/44] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/44] | 28.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.07.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request rejected | 11.03.2015 | Decision despatched | 27.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 27.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees LV, ES, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 26.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 26.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | 26.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 26.07.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 26.07.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.10.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.04.2013 | 30.09.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - MAKINO AMANE ET AL, "Does decrease in ribulose-1,5-bisphosphate carboxylase by antisense RbcS lead to a higher N-use efficiency of photosynthesis under conditions of saturating CO-2 and light in rice plants?", PLANT PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF PLANT PHYSIOLOGISTS, ROCKVILLE, MD, US, (19970101), vol. 114, no. 2, ISSN 0032-0889, pages 483 - 491, XP002540220 [Y] 1-5 * page 483 * | [Y] - PARRY M A J ET AL, "Manipulation of Rubisco: the amount, activity, function and regulation", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL BOTANY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, GB, vol. 54, no. 386, doi:10.1093/JXB/ERG141, ISSN 0022-0957, (20030501), pages 1321 - 1333, (20030314), XP002599744 [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * page 1322 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/JXB/ERG141 | International search | [X]US2008120749 (MELIS ET AL.); | [Y]US2008160591 (WILLSON ET AL.); | [Y]US2007148166 (WU ET AL.); | [Y]US2005260758 (RASOCHOVA ET AL.); | [Y]US2003097678 (KUSHINOV ET AL.); | [A]US2004172678 (GRESSEL ET AL.); | [A]US2008206840 (GERDES ET AL.) | [Y] - CARPENTER., "Phosphorus control is critcal to mitigating eutrophicatio", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20080812), vol. 105, no. 32, pages 11039 - 11040 | [Y] - WYMAN ET AL., "Molecular and Physiological Responses of Two Classes of Marine Chromophytic Phytoplankton (Diatoms and Prymnesiophytes) during the Development of Nutrient-Stimulated Blooms.", APPL ENVIRON MICROBIOL., (2000), vol. 66, no. 6, pages 2349 - 2357 | [A] - GRESSEL., "Transgenics are imperative for biofuel crops.", PLANT SCI., (200803), vol. 174, no. 3, pages 246 - 263, XP022489458 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.plantsci.2007.11.009 |