EP2452165 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING MULTI-PHASE FLUID FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Siemens AG Wittelsbacher Platz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLIKHOV, Stepan Aleksandrovich ul. Mira, 2, appt. 61 Ramenskoe, 140105 / RU | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/20] | Application number, filing date | 09812473.8 | 07.07.2009 | WO2009RU00340 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005133 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2452165 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/704, G01F1/74 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
G01F1/74 (EP,US);
G01F1/704 (EP,US);
G01N23/04 (EP,US);
G01N23/083 (EP,US);
G01N23/087 (US);
G01N23/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG EINER MEHRPHASEN-FLUIDSTRÖMUNG | [2012/20] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING MULTI-PHASE FLUID FLOW | [2012/20] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR MESURER L'ÉCOULEMENT DE FLUIDES DE PLUSIEURS PHASES | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/30] | 13.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9118280 (JACKSON ROGER GEORGE [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-13,16 * page 5, line 32 - page 6, line 13; figures 1-4 * * page 10, line 20 - page 11, line 30; figures 8,10 * [I] 3; | [XI]GB2356453 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [X] 1,2,9-12 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5 - page 6; figures 1-4 * [I] 3-8,13-16; | [XI]WO03106934 (SENSORTEC LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1,2,5,9-12,16 * page 8 * * pages 11,17; figures 1-4 * [I] 3,4,6-8,13-15; | [A] - BIN HU ET AL, "Development of an X-ray computed tomography (CT) system with sparse sources: application to three-phase pipe flow visualization", EXPERIMENTS IN FLUIDS ; EXPERIMENTAL METHODS AND THEIR APPLICATIONS TO FLUID FLOW, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20051001), vol. 39, no. 4, ISSN 1432-1114, pages 667 - 678, XP019338257 [A] 4,6-8,14,15 * page 669; figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00348-005-1008-2 |