EP2329005 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS WITH FREEZING AND MICROWAVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enwave Corporation 2000 - 1066 West Hastings Street Vancouver, British Columbia V6E 3X2 / CA | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURANCE, Timothy, D. 3491 West 38th Ave. Vancouver British Columbia V6N 2X8 / CA | 02 /
FU, Jun 1168 Riverside Drive Port Coquitlam British Columbia V3B 8B3 / CA | 03 /
YAGHMAEE, Parastoo 3466 West 1st Avenue Vancouver British Columbia V6R 1G7 / CA | 04 /
PIKE, Robert, L. 3284 W. 24th Ave. Vancouver British Columbia V6L 1R9 / CA | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Vidon Brevets & Stratégie 16B, rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Larcher, Dominique Cabinet Vidon, 16 B, rue Jouanet, BP 90333 Technopole Atalante 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09812571.9 | 11.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009CA01259 | Priority number, date | US20080096567P | 12.09.2008 Original published format: US 96567 P | [2011/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028488 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2329005 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/42, F26B3/347, A61K9/19, A23L3/54, C07K1/00, C12N1/04, C12N13/00, C12N9/98, C12N9/96, F26B5/06, F26B25/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
C12N13/00 (EP,US);
A23L3/54 (EP,US);
C12M47/14 (EP,US);
C12N1/04 (EP,US);
C12N9/96 (EP,US);
F26B25/001 (EP,US);
F26B5/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | C12M1/42, F26B3/347, A61K9/19, A23L3/54, C07K1/00, C12N1/04, C12N13/00, C12N9/98 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DEHYDRIERUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEM MATERIAL MIT EINFRIEREN UND MIKROWELLE | [2011/23] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR DEHYDRATING BIOLOGICAL MATERIALS WITH FREEZING AND MICROWAVING | [2011/23] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉSHYDRATATION DE MATIÈRES BIOLOGIQUES PAR CONGÉLATION ET MICRO-ONDES | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 26.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006286234 (TSAI HSUN-HENG [TW], et al) [A] 1-25* claim 1 *; | [XPA]WO2009049409 (ENWAVE CORP [CA], et al) [XP] 1-5 * claim 1 * [A] 6-25 | International search | [XP]WO2009033285 (ENWAVE CORP [CA], et al); | [XP]WO2008134835 (SILVESTRO EDDA [BR], et al); | [A]WO2008025258 (LI SHENG [CN]); | [A]WO9738585 (UNIV BRITISH COLUMBIA [CA]) | Examination | CN101126596 | - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 62, Database accession no. 2008-K26355, & CN101126596 A 20080220 (CONG F) |