EP2341643 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FILTER LOCKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2011/27] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANG, Fei Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WU, Shuangqi Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Hongping Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property Department B1-3A, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812643.6 | 02.09.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009CN73691 | Priority number, date | CN20081211900 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: CN200810211900 | [2011/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010028577 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341643 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/155, H01S5/0687, H01S5/40 | [2012/24] | CPC: |
H04B10/572 (EP,US);
H01S5/0687 (EP,US);
H01S5/4087 (EP,US);
H04B10/506 (EP,US);
H01S5/06213 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | H04B10/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR FILTERSPERRE | [2011/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FILTER LOCKING | [2011/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE VERROUILLAGE DE FILTRE | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2011 | Translation filed | 06.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 04.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN1976262 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | EP2091161 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0056] * * figure 3 *; | [I]GB2170370 (BRITISH TELECOMM) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, lines 27-130 * * figure 1 *; | [I]WO9908350 (TADIRAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS LTD [IL], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * page 11, line 28 - page 12, line 16 * * figure 1 *; | [I]US4839614 (HILL GODFREY R [GB], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 18 - column 5, line 11 * * figures 1, 4 *; | [I]US2007014509 (KISH FRED A JR [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0175] * * figure 9 *; | [I]CN101247199 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | US2009232493 [ ] (TU MINHAI [CN]) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0057] * * figures 3-5 * | International search | [A]US2005094685 (COLIN SYLVAIN M [US], et al); | [A]CN101057424 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [X]CN101247199 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A] - CAI, HU ET AL., "Time Division Sub-carrier Semiconductor DFB Laser Multi-wavelength ocker", CHINESE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, (200312), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 711 - 714, XP008146341 |