EP2337352 - CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2011/25] |
Former [2011/25] | For all designated states Nec Corporation 7-1 Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Kunihiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
ISHIKAWA, Kazushige c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | 03 /
ASAMI, Kazuo c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2015/01] |
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Kunihiro c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
02 /
ISHIKAWA, Kazushige c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | |||
03 /
ASAMI, Kazuo c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Betten & Resch Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/25] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09812822.6 | 14.07.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009JP03285 | Priority number, date | JP20080231760 | 10.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008231760 | [2011/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029673 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2337352 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337352 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/00, H04N5/765, H04N5/91, G06Q30/02, H04N21/81, H04N21/472, // H04N21/658 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04N7/17318 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0251 (EP,US);
H04N21/25808 (EP,US);
H04N21/472 (EP,US);
H04N21/47202 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/6125 (EP,US);
H04N21/6582 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
H04N5/76 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/50] | H04N7/173, G06F13/00, H04N5/765, H04N5/91, G06Q30/02, H04N21/81, H04N21/472 | ||
Former IPC [2011/25] | H04N7/173, G06F13/00, H04N5/765, H04N5/91 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSVERTEILUNGSSYSTEM | [2011/25] | English: | CONTENT DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [2011/25] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2011 | Translation filed | 11.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 27.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2009 | AT | 31.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | BG | 31.12.2014 | CY | 31.12.2014 | CZ | 31.12.2014 | DK | 31.12.2014 | EE | 31.12.2014 | ES | 31.12.2014 | FI | 31.12.2014 | HR | 31.12.2014 | IT | 31.12.2014 | LT | 31.12.2014 | LV | 31.12.2014 | MC | 31.12.2014 | MK | 31.12.2014 | MT | 31.12.2014 | NL | 31.12.2014 | PL | 31.12.2014 | PT | 31.12.2014 | RO | 31.12.2014 | SI | 31.12.2014 | SK | 31.12.2014 | SM | 31.12.2014 | TR | 31.12.2014 | NO | 31.03.2015 | GR | 01.04.2015 | IS | 30.04.2015 | IE | 14.07.2015 | LU | 14.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | FR | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/37] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MK | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 14.07.2009 | |
AT | 31.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
BG | 31.12.2014 | ||
CY | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
SM | 31.12.2014 | ||
TR | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
MT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
IE | 14.07.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
FR | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
LU | 14.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
MC | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SI | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
IT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
DK | 31.12.2014 | ||
EE | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 31.12.2014 | |
CZ | 31.12.2014 | ||
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
IS | 30.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
PL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
SK | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 31.12.2014 | |
ES | 31.12.2014 | ||
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
RO | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 31.12.2014 | |
FI | 31.12.2014 | ||
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NL | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
HR | 31.12.2014 | ||
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
LV | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
GR | 01.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 31.12.2014 | |
LT | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 31.12.2014 | |
NO | 31.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 31.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003149975 (ELDERING CHARLES [US] ET AL) [Y] 5,17 * paragraphs [0097] , [0 10] , [ 163]; figure 7 *; | [A]WO2007093126 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]; YAN JUN [CN]; LI JINCHENG [CN]; WU XIANGYANG) [A] 1,15 * the whole document *; | [APL]EP1988666 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [AP] 1,15 * translation of WO2007093126 in time * [L] ; | [A]US2005060229 (RIEDL STEVE [US] ET AL) [A] 1,5,15,17 * figure 5d *; | [A]WO0221839 (CACHESTREAM CORP [US]) [A] 1,5,15,17 * the whole document *; | [XYI] - OLIVER FRIEDRICH ET AL, "Interactive and Personalized Services for an Open IMS-Based IPTV Infrastructure", NETWORKING, 2008. ICN 2008. SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20080413), ISBN 978-0-7695-3106-9, pages 302 - 307, XP031246514 [X] 1,2,4,15,16,18-20,22 * the whole document * * figures 1,6 * [Y] 5,17 [I] 3,6-10 | [A] - DVB ORGANIZATION, "cm-iptv0379r4.doc", DVB, DIGITAL VIDEO BROADCASTING, C/O EBU - 17A ANCIENNE ROUTE - CH-1218 GRAND SACONNEX, GENEVA - SWITZERLAND, (20080306), XP017827546 [A] 1,15 * pages 12, 15 * | [A] - HYOJIN PARK KOREA (REP OF), "Draft Supplement: IPTV service scenarios;TD 294 (GEN/13)", ITU-T DRAFT ; STUDY PERIOD 2005-2008, INTERNATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATION UNION, GENEVA ; CH, (20080115), vol. Q1/13, Q2/13, Q8/13 and Q22/16, pages 1 - 40, XP017559321 [A] 1,15 * pages 22-24 * | International search | [Y]JP2008022298 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE, et al); | [Y]JP2004240709 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2003319363 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [Y]JP2005115587 (NEC CORP) | by applicant | JP2008153896 | JP2008231760 |