EP2322692 - ETCHANT FOR TITANIUM-BASED METAL, TUNGSTEN-BASED METAL, TITANIUM-TUNGSTEN-BASED METAL OR NITRIDES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2011/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Hironosuke c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 4980 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | 02 /
SAITO, Yasuo c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 4980 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | [2016/41] |
Former [2011/20] | 01 /
SATO, Hironosuke c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 4980 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | ||
02 /
SAITO, Yasuo c/o SHOWA DENKO K.K. 4980 Kaisei-cho Shunan-shi Yamaguchi 746-0006 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2011/20] | Fischer, Heinrich Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09813013.1 | 25.08.2009 | [2011/20] | WO2009JP65136 | Priority number, date | JP20080231325 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008231325 | [2011/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029867 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2322692 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2322692 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C23F1/38, C23F1/44, C11D11/00, C23G1/20 | [2015/19] | CPC: |
C23F1/38 (EP,KR,US);
C23F1/26 (KR);
C23F1/40 (KR);
C23F1/44 (EP,US);
C23G1/205 (EP,US);
H01L21/32134 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/20] | C23F1/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/41] |
Former [2011/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÄTZMITTEL FÜR METALLE AUF TITANBASIS, METALLE AUF TUNGSTENBASIS, METALLE AUF TITAN-TUNGSTEN-BASIS ODER NITRIDE DAVON | [2011/20] | English: | ETCHANT FOR TITANIUM-BASED METAL, TUNGSTEN-BASED METAL, TITANIUM-TUNGSTEN-BASED METAL OR NITRIDES THEREOF | [2011/20] | French: | AGENT DE GRAVURE POUR MÉTAL À BASE DE TITANE, MÉTAL À BASE DE TUNGSTÈNE, MÉTAL À BASE DE TITANE ET DE TUNGSTÈNE OU NITRURES DE CEUX-CI | [2011/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2011 | Translation filed | 05.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 13.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 15.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2009 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | HR | 12.10.2016 | IT | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | MK | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | SM | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | BG | 12.01.2017 | NO | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
MK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.08.2009 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
IT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
SM | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
HR | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
NO | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1826260 (LEE GI WON [KR]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * page 3, paragraphs 11-13, 16, 18-19 * * page 4, paragraph 24 - page 5, paragraph 29 * * page 5, paragraph 35 - page 6, paragraph 40 * * page 6, paragraph 45 - page 7, paragraph 50 * * example 2; table 4 * * claims 1, 6-8, 11-14 *; | [X]EP0292057 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,4-8 * page 2, column 1, lines 1-7 * * page 2, column 1, line 32 - page 2, column 2, line 30 * * page 2, column 2, lines 41-51 * * page 3; examples 1-4 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]US4554050 (MINFORD WILLIAM J [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7,8 * column 1, lines 55-65 * * column 2, lines 7-27, 46-51 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 16 * * claims 1-7 *; | [X]DE4110595 (TYSSEN EDELSTHALWERKE AG, DE) [X] 1,2,6,7 * page 2, lines 3-5 * * page 2, line 39 - page 3, line 30 * * page 3, lines 57-59, 62-65 * * page 4, lines 1-53; examples 1-2 * * page 5, lines 10-26; example 4; table 1 * * page 6, lines 1-18; table 2 *; | [X]US5462638 (DATTA MADHAV [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * column 5, line 11 - page 6, line 35 * * column 7, lines 1-58; figure 2 * * claims 1-19 *; | [X]US5759437 (DATTA MADHAV [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8 * the whole document * | International search | [X]JPS63305518 (PHILIPS NV); | [Y]JPH06310492 (FUJI XEROX CO LTD); | [Y]JP2005146358 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [Y]JP2008536312 (SACHEM, INC.) |