EP2330658 - BATTERY SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.09.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKE Hiroyoshi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
NOUMI Shunsuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
ODANE Chiharu c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 04 /
SHINTANI Takuji c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2012/47] |
Former [2011/23] | 01 /
TAKE Hiroyoshi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | ||
02 /
NOUMI Shunsuke c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
03 /
ODANE Chiharu c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | |||
04 /
SHINTANI Takuji c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2 Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | Representative(s) | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/24] | Nevant, Marc, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2011/23] | Hart-Davis, Jason, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09813047.9 | 07.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP65597 | Priority number, date | JP20080230539 | 09.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008230539 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010029901 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330658 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330658 | Date: | 21.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/0525 | [2012/25] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/446 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/403 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/449 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP,KR);
Y10T29/4911 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | H01M2/16, H01M10/05 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | BATTERIESEPARATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE LITHIUMIONENSEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/23] | English: | BATTERY SEPARATOR AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND LITHIUM ION SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2011/23] | French: | SÉPARATEUR DE BATTERIE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE AU LITHIUM-ION ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2011 | Translation filed | 16.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 28.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2009 | AT | 21.11.2012 | BE | 21.11.2012 | CY | 21.11.2012 | CZ | 21.11.2012 | DK | 21.11.2012 | EE | 21.11.2012 | FI | 21.11.2012 | HR | 21.11.2012 | IS | 21.11.2012 | IT | 21.11.2012 | LT | 21.11.2012 | LV | 21.11.2012 | MC | 21.11.2012 | MK | 21.11.2012 | MT | 21.11.2012 | NL | 21.11.2012 | PL | 21.11.2012 | RO | 21.11.2012 | SE | 21.11.2012 | SI | 21.11.2012 | SK | 21.11.2012 | SM | 21.11.2012 | TR | 21.11.2012 | BG | 21.02.2013 | NO | 21.02.2013 | GR | 22.02.2013 | ES | 04.03.2013 | PT | 21.03.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.09.2009 | |
AT | 21.11.2012 | ||
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
MK | 21.11.2012 | ||
MT | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
TR | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CY | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
SM | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
MC | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
IT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
NL | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
RO | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
EE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
SK | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
DK | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
BG | 21.02.2013 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 21.11.2012 | |
BE | 21.11.2012 | ||
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
PT | 21.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/27] | BE | 21.11.2012 | |
FI | 21.11.2012 | ||
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
SI | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
GR | 22.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
HR | 21.11.2012 | ||
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
LV | 21.11.2012 | ||
PL | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 21.11.2012 | |
LT | 21.11.2012 | ||
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
ES | 04.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
SE | 21.11.2012 | ||
NO | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 21.11.2012 | |
NO | 21.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XL]EP1365461 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] - [0007] - [0012] - [0015] - [0018] - [0020] - [0022] - [0025] - [0029] - [0031] * * example 1 * [L] 1-12; | [X]WO2008098137 (ZETTACORE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-9,11 * paragraph [0080] * * example 3 ** claims 11,12,18-22 * | International search | [A]JP2001319634 (CELGARD INC); | [A]JP2004047439 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [A]JP2007188777 (SONY CORP); | [XP]JP2008287888 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP) | by applicant | JP2007227361 | - 46TH BATTERY SYMPOSIUM, (2005), pages 342 - 343 |