EP2334841 - FILMS CONTAINING AN INFUSED OXYGENATED GAS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brigham Young University Technology Transfer Office, 3760 HBLL Provo, UT 84602 / US | [2011/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Matthew, C. 1512 E 920 S Provo, UT 84606 / US | 02 /
DAVIS, Robert, C. 426 E 2100 N Provo, UT 84604 / US | 03 /
HANSON, Douglas, P. 1278 South 1250 East Spanish Fork, UT 84660 / US | 04 /
LINFORD, Matthew, R. 845 E 1080 N Orem, UT 84097 / US | 05 /
LUNT, Barry, M. 2049 Lakeview Drive Provo, UT 84604 / US | [2011/52] |
Former [2011/39] | 01 /
ASPLUND, Matthew, C. 1512 E 920 S Provo, UT 84606 / US | ||
02 /
DAVIS, Robert, C. 426 E 2100 N Provo, UT 84604 / US | |||
03 /
HANSON, Douglas, P. 1250 E 1278 S Spanish Fork, UT 84660 / US | |||
04 /
LINFORD, Matthew, R. 845 E 1080 N Orem, UT 84097 / US | |||
05 /
LUNT, Barry, M. 2049 Lakeview Drive Provo, UT 84604 / US | |||
Former [2011/25] | 01 /
ASPLUND, Matthew, C. 1512 E 920 S Provo UT 84606 / US | ||
02 /
DAVIS, Robert, C. 426 E 2100 N Provo UT 84604 / US | |||
03 /
HANSON, Douglas, P. 1250 E 1278 S Spanish Fork UT 84660 / US | |||
04 /
LINFORD, Matthew, R. 845 E 1080 N Orem UT 84097 / US | |||
05 /
LUNT, Barry, M. 2729 Edgewood Drive Provo, UT 84604 / US | Representative(s) | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/03] | Cooper, John Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2011/25] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 09813393.7 | 27.05.2009 | [2011/25] | WO2009US45355 | Priority number, date | US20080191925P | 12.09.2008 Original published format: US 191925 P | [2011/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010030419 | Date: | 18.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2334841 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C14/34, C01B31/02, B32B7/02, B29C63/00, C03C17/00, G11B7/243, G11B7/0045 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
C23C14/0605 (EP,KR,US);
B32B27/365 (KR);
B64G1/226 (EP,KR,US);
C03C17/22 (EP,KR,US);
C23C14/34 (KR);
G02B1/105 (EP);
G02B1/14 (EP,KR,US);
G11B7/00452 (EP,US);
G11B7/2437 (EP,US);
H01L21/2855 (EP,US);
H01M4/02 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2457/00 (KR);
B32B2509/00 (KR);
B32B2535/00 (KR);
B32B2605/00 (KR);
C03C2217/28 (KR);
C03C2217/282 (EP,US);
G11B2007/24328 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/25] | C23C16/26, C23C14/34, C01B31/02, B32B7/02, B29C63/00, C03C17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/25] | Title | German: | FILME MIT EINEM INFUNDIERTEN MIT SAUERSTOFF ANGEREICHERTEN GAS UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2011/25] | English: | FILMS CONTAINING AN INFUSED OXYGENATED GAS AND METHODS FOR THEIR PREPARATION | [2011/25] | French: | FILMS CONTENANT UN GAZ OXYGÉNÉ INFUSÉ ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION | [2011/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 08.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4647947 (TAKEOKA YOSHIKATSU [JP], et al) [AD] 1* column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 7 *; | [X]JPS6387283 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0567885 (IBM [US]) [A] 1 * claim 9 *; | [X]EP0605891 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,6-9,15 * example 1 *; | [XI]WO0168790 (MAT GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 7-14 * claims 1, 5 * [I] 15; | [X]US2005025035 (NAKAI TSUKASA [JP], et al) [X] 7-11,13-15 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046] * | International search | [X]US5169676 (MORAN MARK B [US], et al); | [Y]US5830332 (BABICH EDWARD D [US], et al); | [Y] - GUO, Y.-B. ET AL., "Adhesion improvements for diamond-like carbon films on polycarbonate and polymethylmethacrylate substrates by ion plating with inductively coupled plasma", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (20030212), vol. 12, no. 3-7, pages 946 - 952, XP004423789 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-9635(02)00320-5 | [Y] - ICHINOSE, H. ET AL., "Effects of Organometallic Compounds Introduced to Plasma on Diamond Synthesis", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (199301), vol. 32, no. 1A, pages 144 - 149, XP008135587 | [A] - KAWATO, T. ET AL., "Effects of Oxygen on CVD Diamond Synthesis", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (198709), vol. 26, no. 9, pages 1429 - 1432, XP008135589 |