Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2735848 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2015 | C | CA2735848 | 18.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US55531 | 31.08.2009 | US28333608 | 10.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2334209 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2014 | B1 | EP2334209 | 24.07.2013 | A4 | EP2334209 | 22.06.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US55531 | 31.08.2009 | US28333608 | 10.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010030526 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2010 | A4 | WO2010030526 | 17.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010030526 | 18.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US28333608 | 10.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7836523 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2010 | B2 | US2010058515 | 11.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US28333608 | 10.09.2008 |