EP2394131 - APPARATUS FOR FASTENING AN ADDITIONAL DEVICE TO A WEAPON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kilic, Michael Ali Heidenfelder Strasse 1 97525 Schwebheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Kilic, Michael Ali Hauptstrasse 26 97534 Waigolshausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 09813826.6 | 22.12.2009 | WO2009DE01801 | Priority number, date | DE20092001264U | 03.02.2009 Original published format: DE 202009001264 U | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010088868 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394131 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394131 | Date: | 19.02.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41G11/00, F41G1/387 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
F41G11/003 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | F41G1/387 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER ZUSATZEINRICHTUNG AN EINER WAFFE | [2011/50] | English: | APPARATUS FOR FASTENING AN ADDITIONAL DEVICE TO A WEAPON | [2011/50] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR FIXER UN ACCESSOIRE SUR UNE ARME | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 13.10.2011 | Observations by third parties | 22.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2009 | BG | 19.02.2014 | CY | 19.02.2014 | DK | 19.02.2014 | EE | 19.02.2014 | FI | 19.02.2014 | HR | 19.02.2014 | LT | 19.02.2014 | LV | 19.02.2014 | MC | 19.02.2014 | MK | 19.02.2014 | MT | 19.02.2014 | NL | 19.02.2014 | RO | 19.02.2014 | SE | 19.02.2014 | SI | 19.02.2014 | SK | 19.02.2014 | SM | 19.02.2014 | NO | 19.05.2014 | GR | 20.05.2014 | IS | 19.06.2014 | PT | 19.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
MT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.12.2009 | |
BG | 19.02.2014 | ||
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 19.02.2014 | |
CY | 19.02.2014 | ||
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
GR | 20.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
MC | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
SM | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SI | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
SK | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
RO | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
DK | 19.02.2014 | ||
EE | 19.02.2014 | ||
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
HR | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
LV | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
NL | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 19.02.2014 | |
FI | 19.02.2014 | ||
LT | 19.02.2014 | ||
SE | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | ||
PT | 19.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 19.02.2014 | |
NO | 19.05.2014 | ||
IS | 19.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006104064 (SHARRAH RAYMOND L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,11-13 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraphs [0080] , [0081] * * figures 1-9 * [I] 5,8,10; | [X]US4799325 (BOOZE RAYMOND F [US]) [X] 1-3,6,11-13 * column 7, line 66 - column 9, line 38 * * figures 9-11 *; | [X]DE19918635 (HECKLER & KOCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US7308772 (MILLETT JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-3,11-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5787630 (MARTEL PHILLIP C [US]) [X] 1,2,4,11-13 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 25 * * figure - *; | [X]DE202008004186U (MANZ GEORG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,11-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4799325 | DE19918635 | DE202008004186U | DE202006004620U | US2006104064 | other | DE202006004620U |