EP2376877 - STORAGE TANK MONITORING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentinel Import Export (Ireland) Limited Lavallyroe Ballyhaunis Co Mayo 459 624 / IE | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENBY, Carl PO Box 157 A130 Duquesa Business Centre Sabinillas E-29692 Manliva / ES | 02 /
REINHARDT, Kurt Lavallyroe Ballyhaunis Co. Mayo 459 624 / IE | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/42] | Spaargaren, Jerome, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London, Greater London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09813855.5 | 09.12.2009 | WO2009EP66771 | Priority number, date | GB20080022415 | 09.12.2008 Original published format: GB 0822415 | [2011/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010066813 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2376877 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01F23/26 | [2011/42] | CPC: |
G01F23/266 (EP,US);
G01F23/268 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPEICHERTANK-ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/42] | English: | STORAGE TANK MONITORING APPARATUS | [2011/42] | French: | APPAREIL DE SURVEILLANCE DE RÉSERVOIR DE STOCKAGE | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 01.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 22.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2226060 (JOHNSON JR GEORGE T) [Y] 3,4,7 * page 2 - page 3; figure 1 * [A] 1,2,5,6,8-19; | [XA]US3974695 (LERNER JULIUS) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-19; | [YA]GB2082326 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO) [Y] 3,4,7 * page 1 * [A] 1,2,5,6,8-19; | [XAY]JPS5842926 (TOKYO TATSUNO KK) [X] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * [A] 8-19 [Y] 3,4,7; | [XY]US4601201 (OOTA YASUTO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,13-15,17,19 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 18; figures 6,1A,2A * [Y] 3,4,7,9-12,16,18; | [YA]US4717671 (MELPOLDER FRANK W [US]) [Y] 3,4,7 * column 1 - column 2; claim 1 * [A] 1,2,5,6,8-19; | [Y]US4813284 (MILLER DAVID C [US], et al) [Y] 9-12,16,18* the whole document *; | [YA]GB2259366 (BRITISH PETROLEUM CO PLC [GB]) [Y] 3,4,7 * page 4 * [A] 1,2,5,6,8-12 | Examination | US4748846 | WO0043735 | US6431950 |