EP2341766 - CONTAINER GARDENING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Junkeer, Nicola 8B Surrey Road South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Junkeer, Nicola 8B Surrey Road South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | ||
For all designated states Junkeer, Gerald 8B Surrey Road South Yarra, Victoria 3141 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JUNKEER, Gerald 8B Surrey Road, South Yarra Victoria 3141 / AU | [2011/31] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard London EC2V 5AE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Laudens Blackwell House Guildhall Yard GB-London EC2V 5AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 09813871.2 | 21.04.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009AU00497 | Priority number, date | AU20080100918 | 16.09.2008 Original published format: AU 2008100918 | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031104 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2341766 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A01G27/04 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
A01G27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | GARTENBEHÄLTERSYSTEM | [2011/28] | English: | CONTAINER GARDENING SYSTEM | [2011/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE JARDINAGE À CONTENANT | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1444834 (SCHMID W); | [X]WO9935899 (SMITH GREGORY J [US]); | [X]US4184287 (ROTH JACQUES [FR]); | [X]US4356665 (DE OLIVEIRA NENZITO C); | [X]US4171593 (BIGGLESTONE EDWIN J [CA]); | [X]US4993186 (IMMONEN HENRIK [FI]); | [Y]US1940044 (ERICK BRANDT); | [Y]US3576088 (ARCA RENE); | [Y]DE19809984 (EDELMANN JOERG [DE]) |