EP2338000 - AIR-FLOW-CONTROLLING REAR HOUSING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2016 [2016/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Absolute Combustion International Inc. Bay 2 2915 - 19th Street N.E. Calgary, Alberta T2E 7A2 / CA | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states Karringten, Darsell Bay 2 2915 19th Street Calgary, Alberta T2M 0K3 / CA | ||
For all designated states Kelly, William Bay 2 2915 19th Street N. E. Calgary, Alberta L2M 0K3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARRINGTON, Darsell Bay 2, 2915 19th Street N.E. Calgary, Alberta T2M OK3 / CA | 02 /
KELLY, William Bay 2, 2915 19th Street N.E. Calgary, Alberta T2M OK3 / CA | [2015/46] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Orr, Robert Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/37] | Orr, Robert Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2011/33] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Wihlsson, Joakim Per Magnus Bjerkéns Patentbyra KB Östermalmsgatan 58 114 50 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 09813937.1 | 22.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009CA01309 | Priority number, date | US20080099200P | 22.09.2008 Original published format: US 99200 P | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031175 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338000 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F23D14/62, F23C9/00, F23L7/00, F23C7/00, F23D14/70, F23L1/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
F23C7/008 (EP,US);
F23D14/24 (EP,US);
F23D14/70 (EP,US);
F23L1/00 (EP,US);
F23L2900/07006 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | F23D14/62, F23C9/00, F23L7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | RÜCKWÄRTIGES GEHÄUSEELEMENT FÜR LUFTSTROMSTEUERUNG | [2011/26] | English: | AIR-FLOW-CONTROLLING REAR HOUSING MEMBER | [2011/26] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE LOGEMENT ARRIÈRE DE RÉGULATION DU DÉBIT D'AIR | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 28.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.03.2012 | 30.09.2016 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3154134 (BLOOM FREDERICK S) [X] 1,4,6-8,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,5,9-12; | [X]US2002039711 (RIO LAURENT [FR], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6494710 (KIM JONG SOO [KR], et al) [Y] 5,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]US1370486 (JOHN REID) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5380194 (POLOMCHAK ROBERT W [US], et al) [Y] 9,12 * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US5603211 (GRAVES CHARLES B [US]); | [A]US2005271990 (LIFSHITS VLADIMIR [US]); | [A]US6695609 (CHUNG I-PING [US], et al) | by applicant | US7484956 | US7429173 | US7422427 | US6485289 |