EP2339872 - DE-MASSING METHOD OF POSITION ADVERTISING SERVICE BASED ON REGIONAL STRATEGY AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, Tianchao ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
PENG, Yonglin ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
XU, Yiliang ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2011/26] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2011/26] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09814014.8 | 24.08.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009CN73443 | Priority number, date | CN200810216187 | 16.09.2008 Original published format: CN200810216187 | [2011/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010031294 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2339872 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, G06Q30/02 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
H04W4/23 (EP,US);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
H04L67/52 (EP);
H04W4/20 (EP);
H04W4/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | H04W4/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/26] | Title | German: | ENTMASSUNGSVERFAHREN EINES WERBUNGSPOSITIONIERUNGSDIENSTES AUF DER BASIS EINER REGIONALEN STRATEGIE UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2011/26] | English: | DE-MASSING METHOD OF POSITION ADVERTISING SERVICE BASED ON REGIONAL STRATEGY AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2011/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉMASSIFICATION DE SERVICES DE POSITION DE PUBLICITÉ BASÉ SUR UNE STRATÉGIE RÉGIONALE ET SON SYSTÈME | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 15.04.2011 | Translation filed | 15.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 29.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2018 | 30.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/19] | 28.12.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0035216 (SPOTCAST COMMUNICATIONS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 5, line 15 - page 10, line 27 * * page 11, line 15 - page 13, line 17 * * page 15, line 13 - page 22, line 29 * * figure 1 *[I] 2-8,10; | [XI]US2003198346 (MEIFU YOSHINOBU [JP], et al) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0021] - [0041] - [0042] - [0113] - [0119] - [0152] - [0154] - [0160] - [0161] - [0216] - [0217] - [0234] * * figure 18 * [I] 2-8,10 | International search | [X]CN1863331 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101071496 (BEIJING ZHONGQING KAICHENG NET [CN]); | [Y]CN101076136 (TAN SHUJING [CN]); | [XP]CN101370187 (ZTE CORP [CN]) |