29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
13.07.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
04.08.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
01.08.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.05.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.05.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
19.05.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 21.06.2017 [2017/25] |
16.05.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.05.2017 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
16.05.2017 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.05.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
02.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
17.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
26.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
30.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
20.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.05.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
16.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
16.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
06.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.11.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
11.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
22.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] |
24.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|