EP2239602 - PHASE DIFFERENCE PLATE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME, AND DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dexerials Corporation Gate City Osaki East Tower 8th Floor 1-11-2 Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0032 / JP | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUYAMA Kentaro c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
KATAKURA Hitoshi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
OBATA Kei c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 04 /
SHIMIZU Jun c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 05 /
SUZUKI Shinya c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 06 /
HOSHI Mitsunari c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 07 /
INOUE Junichi c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 08 /
KURIYAMA Akito c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09814385.2 | 14.07.2009 | [2010/41] | WO2009JP62702 | Priority number, date | JP20080242203 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008242203 | JP20080305350 | 28.11.2008 Original published format: JP 2008305350 | JP20090068706 | 19.03.2009 Original published format: JP 2009068706 | [2010/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010032540 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239602 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29D11/00, G02B5/30, B29B11/06, B32B27/00, G02B27/22, H04N13/00 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
B29D11/00644 (EP,US);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP,US);
B32B2457/204 (EP,US);
G02B5/045 (EP,US);
G02F1/133555 (EP,US);
G02F1/133631 (EP,US);
G02F1/133634 (EP,US);
G02F1/133636 (EP,US);
G02F1/133638 (EP,US);
G02F2202/023 (EP,US);
G02F2413/02 (EP,US);
G02F2413/05 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | G02B5/30, G02F1/13, G02F1/1335, G02F1/13363 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | PHASENDIFFERENZPLATTE, VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG SOWIE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2010/41] | English: | PHASE DIFFERENCE PLATE, METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SAME, AND DISPLAY DEVICE | [2010/41] | French: | LAME DE DÉPHASAGE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ET DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2010 | Translation filed | 12.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 02.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 16.04.2015 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 06.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/07] | 10.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003189684 (KUNTZ MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2007145702 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH10323787 (NEC CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2003337223 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2003251643 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [X]JP2008100421 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD); | [X]WO2006112480 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2006133385 (NITTO DENKO CORP); | [Y]JP2006309181 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [Y]JPH10161108 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2001188127 (IND TECH RES INST); | [Y]JPH1184131 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | US5686975 | US5327285 | JP3881706B |