08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
24.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
13.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.09.2021 [2021/37] |
06.08.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
04.06.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
07.05.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] |
30.04.2021 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] |
16.04.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] |
05.03.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2021 [2021/14] |
26.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.03.2021 [2021/12] |
12.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] |
05.02.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.03.2021 [2021/10] |
29.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2021 [2021/09] |
25.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
04.12.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
13.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.12.2020 [2020/51] |
06.11.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2020 [2020/50] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
16.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] |
22.05.2020 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.05.2020 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.05.2020 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
23.01.2020 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.09.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.03.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.09.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.09.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.05.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.03.2015 |
First examination report |
|
17.09.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.04.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.11.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 28.12.2011 [2011/52] |
06.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
23.09.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] |
08.07.2011 |
Change - inventor |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
29.04.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
29.04.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] |
04.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|