EP2339737 - POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DIRECT-TYPE AC POWER CONVERTER OR A DIRECT MATRIX CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/26] | POWER CONVERTER, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF AND DIRECT MATRIX CONVERTER | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA Kenichi c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | [2019/18] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
SAKAKIBARA Kenichi c/o Shiga Plant DAIKIN INDUSTRIES LTD. 1000-2 Aza Ootani Okamoto-cho Kusatsu-shi Shiga 525-8526 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2019/18] |
Former [2011/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09814606.1 | 16.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009JP66190 | Priority number, date | JP20080242482 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008242482 | [2011/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010032761 | Date: | 25.03.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2339737 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2339737 | Date: | 01.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
H02M5/4585 (EP);
H02M7/48 (KR);
H02M5/297 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2017/28] | H02M5/297, H02M7/48, H02M5/458 | ||
Former IPC [2011/26] | H02M5/297, H02M7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/18] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LEISTUNGSREGELUNG EINES DIREKT-TYPE AC LEISTUNGSUMRICHTER ODER DIREKT-MATRIX-UMRICHTERS | [2018/50] | English: | POWER CONTROL METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A DIRECT-TYPE AC POWER CONVERTER OR A DIRECT MATRIX CONVERTER | [2018/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE POUR COMMANDER UN CONVERTISSEUR DE COURANT ALTERNATIF DE TYPE DIRECT OU UN CONVERTISSEUR À MATRICE DIRECTE | [2018/50] |
Former [2011/26] | STROMWANDLER, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND DIREKTMATRIXWANDLER | ||
Former [2011/26] | POWER CONVERTER, MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF AND DIRECT MATRIX CONVERTER | ||
Former [2011/26] | CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION, ET CONVERTISSEUR A MATRICE DIRECTE | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2011 | Translation filed | 21.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 09.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2009 | AT | 01.05.2019 | CY | 01.05.2019 | CZ | 01.05.2019 | DK | 01.05.2019 | EE | 01.05.2019 | FI | 01.05.2019 | HR | 01.05.2019 | LT | 01.05.2019 | LV | 01.05.2019 | MC | 01.05.2019 | MK | 01.05.2019 | MT | 01.05.2019 | NL | 01.05.2019 | PL | 01.05.2019 | RO | 01.05.2019 | SE | 01.05.2019 | SI | 01.05.2019 | SK | 01.05.2019 | SM | 01.05.2019 | BG | 01.08.2019 | NO | 01.08.2019 | GR | 02.08.2019 | IS | 01.09.2019 | PT | 01.09.2019 | IE | 16.09.2019 | LU | 16.09.2019 | BE | 30.09.2019 | CH | 30.09.2019 | LI | 30.09.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.09.2009 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
MT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.09.2009 | |
AT | 01.05.2019 | ||
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CY | 01.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
BE | 30.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
IE | 16.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
LU | 16.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
CH | 30.09.2019 | ||
LI | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
MC | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
PL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SI | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
SM | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
EE | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
SK | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 01.05.2019 | |
CZ | 01.05.2019 | ||
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
RO | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 01.05.2019 | |
DK | 01.05.2019 | ||
FI | 01.05.2019 | ||
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
IS | 01.09.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
BG | 01.08.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
LV | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
GR | 02.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
HR | 01.05.2019 | ||
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NL | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
SE | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | ||
PT | 01.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 01.05.2019 | |
LT | 01.05.2019 | ||
NO | 01.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JP2004222338 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS) [YD] 1,4,6,9,11,12 * figures 3,4 * * paragraphs [0022] , [0041] * [A] 2,3,5,7,8,10; | [YA] - AVADHANLU T V ET AL, "Torque Pulsation Minimization in a Variable Speed Inverter-Fed Induction Motor Drive System", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER APPARATUS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19790101), vol. PAS-100, no. 1, ISSN 0018-9510, pages 13 - 18, XP011171267 [Y] 1,4,6,9,11,12 * abstract * * pages 13-15 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,3,5,7,8,10 | International search | [A]JP2005027422 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JP2007110827 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2007312589 (DAIKIN IND LTD); | [A]JPH0681514B (HITACHI, LTD.); | [A]JP2004222338 (FUJI ELECTRIC HOLDINGS); | [A]JP4067021B (DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD.) | by applicant | JP2005027422 | JP2007110827 | JP2007312589 | JPH0681514B | JP2004222338 | JPH0467021B | - LIXIANG WEI; THOMAS.A LIPO, "A Novel Matrix Converter Topology With Simple Commutation", IEEE IAS 2001, (2001), vol. 3, pages 1749 - 1754 | - "Trend of Direct AC/AC Converters and Related Technologies", TECHNICAL REPORT NO. 998 OF THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS OF JAPAN, pages 24 - 25 | - RIE ITOH; ISAO TAKAHASHI, "Decoupling Control of Input and Output Reactive Power of the Matrix Converter", IEEJ TECHNICAL MEETING ON SEMICONDUCTOR POWER CONVERTER |