EP2331074 - GRANULATES, PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM AND PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS CONTAINING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | ||
Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mylan Inc. 781 Chestnut Ridge Road Morgantown, WV 26505 / US | ||
[2020/46] | |||
Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Boyong 4758 Ridgetop Drive Morgantown West Virginia 26508 / US | ||
02 /
REYNOLDS, Thomas D. 4 Pineview Place Morgantown West Virginia 26505 / US | |||
[2011/24] | |||
Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
[2020/46] | |||
Application number, filing date | 09814882.8 | 16.09.2009 | |
[2011/24] | |||
WO2009US05153 | |||
Priority number, date | US20080097667P | 17.09.2008 Original published format: US 97667 P | |
[2011/24] | |||
Filing language | EN | ||
Procedural language | EN | ||
Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | |
No.: | WO2010033179 | ||
Date: | 25.03.2010 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2010/12] | |||
Type: | A1 Application with search report | ||
No.: | EP2331074 | ||
Date: | 15.06.2011 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | |||
[2011/24] | |||
Type: | B1 Patent specification | ||
No.: | EP2331074 | ||
Date: | 11.11.2020 | ||
Language: | EN | ||
[2020/46] | |||
Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2010 |
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2012 | |
Classification | IPC: | A61K9/16, A61K9/20, A61K31/277 | [2012/38] |
CPC: |
A61K9/2027 (EP,US);
A61K31/277 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2059 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP)
| ||
Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/46] | ||
Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | |
BA | Not yet paid | ||
RS | Not yet paid | ||
Title | German: | GRANULAT, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRODUKTE DAMIT | [2011/24] |
English: | GRANULATES, PROCESS FOR PREPARING THEM AND PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS CONTAINING THEM | [2011/24] | |
French: | GRANULÉS, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2011/24] | |
Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | |
22.03.2011 | Search fee paid | ||
22.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | ||
22.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | ||
Examination procedure | 22.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | |
18.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | ||
05.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
02.12.2015 | Observations by third parties | ||
15.12.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
15.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | ||
15.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
15.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
23.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | ||
06.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | ||
18.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
25.07.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
21.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
24.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
18.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
15.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
12.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
07.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | ||
29.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | ||
25.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | ||
07.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | ||
07.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | ||
07.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | ||
Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2015 | ||
Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | |
Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | ||
07.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | ||
07.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
16.09.2020 | Decision despatched | ||
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | |||
07.11.2019 | Request for further processing filed | ||
07.11.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
18.11.2019 | Decision despatched | ||
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | |||
15.02.2019 | Request for further processing filed | ||
15.02.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
27.02.2019 | Decision despatched | ||
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | |||
24.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | ||
24.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
05.06.2018 | Decision despatched | ||
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | |||
25.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | ||
25.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
08.08.2017 | Decision despatched | ||
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | |||
06.10.2016 | Request for further processing filed | ||
06.10.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | ||
18.10.2016 | Decision despatched | ||
Fees paid | Renewal fee | ||
08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | ||
25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | ||
12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | ||
12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | ||
28.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | ||
27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | ||
21.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | ||
06.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | ||
30.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | ||
29.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | ||
Penalty fee | |||
Additional fee for renewal fee | |||
30.09.2012 | 04 M06 Fee paid on 25.02.2013 | ||
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.09.2009 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
MT | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
TR | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
NO | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
[2024/41] | |||
Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0142221 (PHARMACIA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-17 * page 13, paragraph 2; example - * * page 16, paragraph l - page 17, paragraph 1 *; | |
[X]WO2004100944 (SYNTHON BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-11,17 * example - *; | |||
[X]WO2004110431 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-10,17 * example - *; | |||
[X]US2006222707 (LERNER E I [IL], et al) [X] 1-10,12-17 * example 4 *; | |||
[X]WO2007011349 (TEVA PHARMA [IL], et al) [X] 1-11,17 * examples 3,4 *; | |||
[X]EP1889610 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN]) [X] 1-10,12-17* example - *; | |||
[X]US2008161404 (CARROLL KEVIN JOSEPH [GB], et al) [X] 1-11,17 * paragraphs [0115] - [0116] *; | |||
[X]WO2008101723 (KRKA [SI], et al) [X] 1-10,12-17 * example - *; | |||
[X]WO2008104852 (WOCKHARDT RESEARCH CENTER [IN], et al) [X] 12-16 * example 4 * | |||
International search | [X]WO2004110431 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al); | ||
[X]US2008161404 (CARROLL KEVIN JOSEPH [GB], et al) | |||
other | EP1929997 | ||
JP2008133259 |