|
28.10.2016 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2015 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.10.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.06.2015 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
27.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
26.02.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.02.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.10.2014 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.08.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2012 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.2012 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.05.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
31.03.2011 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.04.2010 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
21 |