Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2975902 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2021 | B1 | EP2975902 | 20.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74251 | 27.09.2009 | EP09815627 | 27.09.2009 | CN200810168477 | 28.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2330779 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2015 | B1 | EP2330779 | 25.07.2012 | A4 | EP2330779 | 08.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74251 | 27.09.2009 | CN200810168477 | 28.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2563986T | 17.03.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009CN74251 | 27.09.2009 | CN200810168477 | 28.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010034258 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200810168477 | 28.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101686162B | 21.12.2011 | B | CN101686162 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200810168477 | 28.09.2008 | Type | Divisional application | EP2975902 |