EP2331313 - METHOD OF MAKING A CONTAINER SUCH AS A BOTTLE FROM A PREFORM MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.11.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.12.2011 [2011/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2011/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DETROIS, Christian 19 rue Jacques Brel F-88190 Golbey / FR | 02 /
DIDIER, Eric 21 rue de la Chaux F-88800 Remoncourt / FR | [2011/24] | Application number, filing date | 09815684.7 | 24.09.2009 | [2011/24] | WO2009EP62362 | Priority number, date | EP20080305607 | 29.09.2008 Original published format: EP 08305607 | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010034766 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2331313 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/02, B29B11/14, B29C49/06, B29B11/08, B29B11/12 | [2011/24] | CPC: |
B29B11/14 (EP,US);
B29C49/02 (EP,US);
B29C49/071 (EP);
B29B11/08 (EP,US);
B29B11/12 (EP,US);
B29C2049/7879 (EP);
B29C2949/0715 (EP);
B29C2949/072 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0773 (EP,US);
B29C2949/08 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0817 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0827 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0835 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0836 (EP,US);
B29C2949/0872 (EP,US);
B29C2949/22 (EP,US);
B29C2949/24 (EP,US);
B29C2949/26 (EP,US);
B29C2949/28 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3024 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3032 (EP,US);
B29C2949/3056 (EP,US);
B29C49/06 (EP,US);
B29C49/087 (EP);
B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/258 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7158 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1397 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BEHÄLTERS, WIE ETWA EINER FLASCHE, AUS EINER VORFORM AUS THERMOPLASTISCHEM POLYMER | [2011/24] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING A CONTAINER SUCH AS A BOTTLE FROM A PREFORM MADE OF THERMOPLASTIC POLYMER | [2011/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN RECIPIENT TEL QU'UNE BOUTEILLE A PARTIR D'UNE PREFORME EN POLYMERE THERMOPLASTIQUE | [2011/24] | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 11.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2004041496 (COCA COLA CO [US]); | [A]WO2005066027 (GRAHAM PACKAGING PET TECH [US], et al); | [X]US2006255049 (MCCARTHY DONALD C [US], et al); | [A]US2007087214 (PORTNOY ROBERT C [US], et al) |