|
18.07.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
23.03.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.02.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2016 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.01.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.2015 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.10.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.03.2014 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2014 |
Search started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2011 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2011 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2011 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Translation of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2011 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2011 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2010 |
Copy of the translated international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.04.2010 |
International publication pamphlet |
Search / examination |
14 |