29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
11.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] |
28.06.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
21.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
20.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
20.07.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
04.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] |
20.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] |
09.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] |
02.03.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.04.2018 [2018/14] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
16.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
19.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.02.2018 [2018/08] |
12.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
11.08.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.09.2017 [2017/37] |
04.08.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.08.2017 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] |
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
02.08.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.03.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.03.2017 |
Change - priority |
published on 19.04.2017 [2017/16] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
10.03.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.04.2017 [2017/15] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - German title |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - English title |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
24.02.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 29.03.2017 [2017/13] |
20.02.2017 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
06.09.2016 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
07.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.02.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.09.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.06.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.06.2015 |
First examination report |
|
07.10.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
07.03.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] |
02.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.12.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] |
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.07.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
08.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.08.2011 [2011/32] |
05.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.04.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|