Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9277981 | Global Dossier | 08.03.2016 | B2 | US2012022402 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3263067 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2024 | B9 | EP3263067 | 23.08.2023 | B1 | EP3263067 | 03.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | EP09815714 | 24.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2742409 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2019 | C | CA2742409 | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009295755B | Global Dossier | 16.07.2015 | B2 | AU2009295755 | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2353543 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2017 | B1 | EP2353543 | 09.04.2014 | A4 | EP2353543 | 10.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102223854B | 03.02.2016 | B | CN102223854 | 19.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2353543T | 02.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ592480 | 26.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ612183 | 24.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ59248009 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2514297 | 27.04.2014 | C2 | RU2011116310 | 10.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA100308 | 10.12.2012 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009ES70402 | 24.09.2009 | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010034871 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101587880B | Global Dossier | 22.01.2016 | B1 | KR20110074757 | 01.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2011001119 | 01.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6361874 | 20.01.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2348528 | 28.09.2011 | B1 | ES2348528 | 09.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2966282T | 19.04.2024 | T3 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG193144 | 30.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ES200802740 | 26.09.2008 | Type | Divisional application | EP3263067 |