EP2337847 - VACCINE ADJUVANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej-Dholka Road Bhat, Ahmedabad 382 210 GUJ / IN | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MODI, Indravadan Ambalal - deceased / IN | 02 /
MODI, Rajiv Indravadan Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej - Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad 382210 Gujarat / IN | 03 /
KHAMAR, Bakulesh Mafatlal Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej - Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad 382210 Gujarat / IN | [2015/49] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
MODI, Indravadan Ambalal Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej - Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad 382210 Gujarat / IN | ||
02 /
MODI, Rajiv Indravadan Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej - Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad 382210 Gujarat / IN | |||
03 /
KHAMAR, Bakulesh Mafatlal Cadila Pharmaceuticals Ltd. "Cadila Corporate Campus" Sarkhej - Dholka Road Bhat Ahmedabad 382210 Gujarat / IN | Representative(s) | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2011/26] | Rigby, Barbara Nicole, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09815743.1 | 26.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009IB06950 | Priority number, date | IN2008MUM2080 | 29.09.2008 Original published format: IN MU20802008 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010035119 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2337847 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2337847 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.05.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/39, A61K39/12, A61K39/00, A61K31/56 | [2015/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/56 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/001102 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N5/16 (KR);
A61K2039/5152 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2039/5252 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55511 (EP,US);
C12N2730/10134 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/27] | A61K39/39, A61K39/00, A61K31/56 | ||
Former IPC [2011/26] | C12N5/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFFADJUVANZIEN | [2011/26] | English: | VACCINE ADJUVANTS | [2011/26] | French: | ADJUVANTS POUR DES VACCINS | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 18.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 12.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.10.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.09.2009 | AT | 02.12.2015 | BE | 02.12.2015 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | DK | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | FI | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | NL | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SE | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.03.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | PT | 04.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 26.09.2009 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.09.2009 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.09.2009 | |
AT | 02.12.2015 | ||
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CY | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
BE | 02.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
DK | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
PT | 04.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
NL | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 02.12.2015 | |
FI | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
SE | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
NO | 02.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002119958 (TOJO SHINICHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2004023947 (MARTIN RICHARD [US], et al); | International search | [Y]WO02066612 (ROHM & HAAS [US], et al); | [A]WO2007009194 (UNIV WESTERN AUSTRALIA [AU], et al); | [Y]US2007218086 (TIOLLIER JEROME [FR]) |