EP2328812 - AN APPARATUS FOR SORTING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System S.p.A. Via Ghiarola Vecchia 73 41042 Fiorano Modenese (MO) / IT | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEFANI, Franco Via P. Ferrari 1 I-41049 Sassuolo (Modena) / IT | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani Marchi, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/23] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani Marchi, 20 41124 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 09815751.4 | 27.05.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009IB52211 | Priority number, date | IT2008MO00255 | 29.09.2008 Original published format: IT MO20080255 | [2011/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010035153 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2328812 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65B23/20, B65B35/50, B65G47/90 | [2011/23] | CPC: |
B65B23/20 (EP);
B65B35/50 (EP);
B65G47/907 (EP);
B65G47/918 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SORTIERUNG VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2011/23] | English: | AN APPARATUS FOR SORTING OBJECTS | [2011/23] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRI D'OBJETS | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/22] | 14.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDA]WO2008038081 (SYSTEM SPA [IT]; STEFANI FRANCO [IT]) [XD] 1-4,11-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 2 * [A] 5-10; | [A]EP1803665 (CAVANNA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1,5 *; | [A]FR2676955 (FAVEYRIAL MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2325620 (WERNER JOHANNES) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6 * |