EP2326654 - TRANSITION METAL CATALYTIC SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF ETHYLENE AND ALPHA- OLEFINS USING THE SAME. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/22] | TRANSITION METAL CATALYTIC SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF ETHYLENE AND - OLEFINS USING THE SAME. | ||
[2013/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99 Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states SK Innovation Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | ||
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states SK Energy Co., Ltd. 99, Seorin-dong Jongno-gu Seoul 110-110 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OK, Myungahn 209-302 Gyeongnam Anusville APT. Yongsan-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | 02 /
SHIN, Dongcheol 501-1303 Expo APT. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Jisu SK Daedeok Energy Institute of Technology Green-Pol Development Project Wonchon-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-712 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hoseong 1602-6ho Bongcheon 7-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | 05 /
HAHN, Jongsok 211-1702 Expo APT. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | 06 /
SHIM, Choonsik 101-901 Jangdae Prugio Jangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-308 / KR | [2013/12] |
Former [2011/22] | 01 /
OK, Myungahn 209-302 Gyeongnam Anusville APT. Yongsan-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-500 / KR | ||
02 /
SHIN, Dongcheol 501-1303 Expo APT. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | |||
03 /
JEONG, Jisu SK Daedeok Energy Institute of Technology Green-Pol Development Project Wonchon-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-712 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Hoseong 1602-6ho Bongcheon 7-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | |||
05 /
HAHN, Jongsok 211-1702 Expo APT. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-761 / KR | |||
06 /
SHIM, Choonsik 101-901 Jangdae Prugio Jangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-308 / KR | Representative(s) | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/22] | Albrecht, Thomas Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816418.9 | 23.09.2009 | [2011/22] | WO2009KR05429 | Priority number, date | KR20080094010 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: KR 20080094010 | KR20090081840 | 01.09.2009 Original published format: KR 20090081840 | [2011/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010036025 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2326654 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2326654 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 24.06.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/28, C08F210/16, C08F4/6592, B01J31/38 | [2011/22] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C07F7/28 (KR);
B01J31/38 (KR);
C08F10/02 (KR);
C08F210/02 (KR);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F2420/03 (EP,US);
C08F4/65908 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/08 (US,EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/08 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERGANGSMETALLKATALYSATORSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ETHYLEN-HOMOPOLYMEREN ODER -COPOLYMEREN AUS ETHYLEN UND ALPHA-OLEFINEN DAMIT | [2011/22] | English: | TRANSITION METAL CATALYTIC SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF ETHYLENE AND ALPHA- OLEFINS USING THE SAME. | [2013/11] | French: | SYSTÈMES CATALYTIQUES À MÉTAL DE TRANSITION ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'HOMOPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE OU DE COPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE ET D'ALPHA- -OLÉFINES UTILISANT CEUX-CI | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/22] | TRANSITION METAL CATALYTIC SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PREPARING ETHYLENE HOMOPOLYMERS OR COPOLYMERS OF ETHYLENE AND - OLEFINS USING THE SAME. | ||
Former [2011/22] | SYSTÈMES CATALYTIQUES À MÉTAL DE TRANSITION ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉPARATION D'HOMOPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE OU DE COPOLYMÈRES D'ÉTHYLÈNE ET D' -OLÉFINES UTILISANT CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/22] | 23.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2009 | BE | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MK | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | SM | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | IE | 23.09.2013 | LU | 23.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
SM | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
IE | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 20.03.2013 | |
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6316558 (KANEKO TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [X]EP1845101 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [X]KR20080039794 (SK ENERGY CO LTD [KR]); | [X] - KOTOHIRO NOMURA ET AL., "Ethylene/Styrene Copolymerization by Various (Cyclopentadienyl)(aryloxy)titanium(IV) Complexes-MAO Catalyst Systems", MACROMOLECULES, (2002), vol. 35, no. 14, pages 5388 - 5395, XP008139170 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ma0200773 | [X] - HELMUT G. ALT ET AL., "Effect of the Nature of Metallocene Complexes of Group IV Metals on Their Performance in Catalytic Ethylene and Propylene Polymerization", CHEM. REV., (2000), vol. 100, no. 4, pages 1205 - 1222, XP008146392 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cr9804700 | [A] - SHANA J. STURLA ET AL., "Monocyclopentadienyltitanium Aryloxide Complexes: Preparation, Characterization, and Application in Cyclization Reactions", ORGANOMETALLICS, (20020124), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 739 - 748, XP008109582 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om010755u |