EP2338090 - SIMULTANEOUS ZERO VERIFICATION FOR MOTORS IN A PRINTING PRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Goss International Americas, Inc. 121 Technology Drive Durham, NH 03824 / US | [2011/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ST. OURS, Joseph, Adrian 40 Tamarack Road Lee NH 03824 / US | 02 /
CAVEN, Brian, Patrick 43 Mallard Lane Dover NH 03820 / US | 03 /
COTE, Kevin, Lauren 923 Lairds Lane Allen TX 75013 / US | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/26] | 01 /
ST. OURS, Joseph, Adrian 40 Tamarack Road Lee NH 03824 / US | ||
02 /
CAVEN, Brian, Patrick 123 Spur Road Dover NH 03820 / US | |||
03 /
COTE, Kevin, Lauren 923 Lairds Lane Allen TX 75013 / US | Representative(s) | Lavoix Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | Lavoix Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Kling, Simone Lavoix Munich Bayerstrasse 85a 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816749.7 | 22.09.2009 | [2011/26] | WO2009US57765 | Priority number, date | US20080284823 | 25.09.2008 Original published format: US 284823 | [2011/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010036627 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2338090 | Date: | 29.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2338090 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/32, G05B19/401, H02P5/52, H02P6/20 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
G05B19/4015 (EP,US);
H02P5/52 (EP,US);
H02P6/20 (EP,US);
B41P2213/734 (EP,US);
G05B2219/42215 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50042 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50216 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | G05B11/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2011/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIMULTANER NULLABGLEICH VON MOTOREN IN EINER DRUCKPRESSE | [2011/26] | English: | SIMULTANEOUS ZERO VERIFICATION FOR MOTORS IN A PRINTING PRESS | [2011/26] | French: | VÉRIFICATION ZÉRO SIMULTANÉE POUR LES MOTEURS D UNE PRESSE À IMPRIMER | [2011/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 08.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2009 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | HR | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | MK | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | SM | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | NO | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | GB | 22.09.2018 | IE | 22.09.2018 | LU | 22.09.2018 | MT | 22.09.2018 | BE | 30.09.2018 | CH | 30.09.2018 | FR | 30.09.2018 | LI | 30.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.09.2009 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
MK | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 22.09.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 22.09.2009 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 22.09.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 22.09.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 22.09.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
MT | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
GB | 22.09.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
CH | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
LI | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
BE | 30.09.2018 | ||
FR | 30.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
IE | 22.09.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
LU | 22.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
SM | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
HR | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
NO | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5379211 (MCVENES TIMOTHY D [US]) [X] 1,8 * column 5, line 48 - line 61; figures 1,2 * [A] 7,12 [I] 2-6,9-11,13-15; | [A]US4992731 (LORENZEN DAVID M [US]) [A] 9 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2005284318 (HAJEK JOSEF [DE], et al); | [Y]US2005000380 (RICHARDS JOHN SHERIDAN [US]); | [Y]US2006100723 (SUN DONG [HK], et al); | [Y]US6642506 (NAHUM MICHAEL M [US], et al); | [Y]US2005263688 (KAUHANEN PETTERI [FI]) | by applicant | US5379211 | US2944644 | US6408747 | US7044058 |