EP2344634 - METHODS FOR CULTIVATING CELLS, PROPAGATING AND PURIFYING VIRUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.08.2016 [2016/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jonathan 353 Silverlake Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | 02 /
THOMPSON, Mark 17470 Serene Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | 03 /
MARANGA, Luis J. 11 Canterbury Hill Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 04 /
CATANIAG, Floro 109 San Tomas Drive Pittsburg, CA 94565 / US | 05 /
HSU, Simon, S. 4033 Second Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2011/37] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
LIU, Jonathan 353 Silverlake Court Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | ||
02 /
THOMPSON, Mark 17470 Serene Drive Morgan Hill, CA 95037 / US | |||
03 /
MARANGA, Luis, J. 1974 Garzoni Place Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
04 /
CATANIAG, Floro 109 San Tomas Drive Pittsburg, CA 94565 / US | |||
05 /
HSU, Simon, S. 4033 Second Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/29] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816828.9 | 24.09.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US58157 | Priority number, date | US20090187721P | 17.06.2009 Original published format: US 187721 P | US20080099749P | 24.09.2008 Original published format: US 99749 P | US20080104933P | 13.10.2008 Original published format: US 104933 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010036760 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2344634 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/02, A61K39/145 | [2012/35] | CPC: |
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
C12N7/02 (KR,US);
A61K39/145 (US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N7/00 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16051 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | C12N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZELLKULTIVIERUNG SOWIE VERMEHRUNG UND REINIGUNG VON VIREN | [2011/29] | English: | METHODS FOR CULTIVATING CELLS, PROPAGATING AND PURIFYING VIRUSES | [2011/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE CULTURE DE CELLULES, ET DE PROPAGATION ET DE PURIFICATION DE VIRUS | [2011/29] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 22.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/35] | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0870508 (DUPHAR INT RES [NL]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [XDY]US2006188977 (SCHWARTZ RICHARD [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,6-9 * paragraphs [0065] , [ 179] - [0180]; example 7 * [Y] 2,5; | [X]WO2008105931 (MEDIMMUNE VACCINES INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9 * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0110] *; | [XP]WO2008125361 (MAX PLANCK GESELLSCHAFT [DE], et al) [XP] 1-9 * page 16; table 2 *; | [Y] - M. W. WOLFF ET AL, "Downstream Processing: From Egg to Cell Culture-Derived Influenza Virus Particles", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING & TECHNOLOGY, (20080601), vol. 31, no. 6, doi:10.1002/ceat.200800118, ISSN 0930-7516, pages 846 - 857, XP055031714 [Y] 2,5 * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ceat.200800118 | [A] - BERND KALBFUSS ET AL, "Purification of cell culture-derived human influenza A virus by size-exclusion and anion-exchange chromatography", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20070401), vol. 96, no. 5, doi:10.1002/bit.21109, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 932 - 944, XP055031599 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.21109 | [T] - WOLF MICHAEL W ET AL, "Downstream processing of cell culture-derived virus particles", EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES, UK, (20111001), vol. 10, no. 10, ISSN 1744-8395, pages 1451 - 1475, XP009155868 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/erv.11.111 | International search | [A]US2006188977 (SCHWARTZ RICHARD [US], et al); | [X]WO2008105931 (MEDIMMUNE VACCINES INC [US], et al) |