EP2342629 - EFFICIENT METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CUSTOMIZED MANUFACTURE OF SHOES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIKE Innovate C.V. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005-6453 / US | [2014/32] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Nike International, Ltd. One Bowerman Drive Beaverton, OR 97005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEAN, Anthony One Bowerman Drive Beaverton OR 97005 / US | 02 /
BEREND, Thomas One Bowerman Drive Beaverton OR 97005 / US | 03 /
FUSCO, Ciro One Bowerman Drive Beaverton OR 97005 / US | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/13] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart, et al Forrester & Boehmert SkyGarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | Beattie, Alex Thomas Stewart Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09816993.1 | 28.09.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009US58620 | Priority number, date | US20080194355P | 26.09.2008 Original published format: US 194355 P | [2011/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010037029 | Date: | 01.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2342629 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F7/00, G06Q30/06, G06Q10/06, A43B3/24 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
A43B3/24 (EP,US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0621 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | G06F7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTES VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG MASSGESCHNEIDERTER SCHUHE | [2011/28] | English: | EFFICIENT METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CUSTOMIZED MANUFACTURE OF SHOES | [2011/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME EFFICACES POUR LA FABRICATION PERSONNALISÉE DE CHAUSSURES | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 08.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/36] | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.11.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2008147219 (JONES DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 12 * the whole document * [I] 1-15; | [I]US2005256776 (BAYOUMI DEIA S [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2008189194 (BENTVELZEN JOSEPH [US]); | [Y]US2008060220 (LYDEN ROBERT M [US]); | [Y]US2007043464 (ZEIF ALEX G [US]); | [A]US2007043582 (PEVETO MIKAL [IT], et al); | [A]US2005071242 (ALLEN MARK K [US], et al); | [A]US2008134543 (KLEIN MARK [US]) | by applicant | US2008147219 |