EP2330076 - NANO-CARBON MATERIAL COMPOSITE SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppan Printing Co., Ltd. 5-1, Taito 1-chome Taito-ku Tokyo 110-0016 / JP | [2011/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAMO, Hidenori / JP | 02 /
KODAMA, Yoshihiro / JP | 03 /
TAMURA, Akira / JP | [2011/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/23] | Application number, filing date | 09817825.4 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/23] | WO2009JP67061 | Priority number, date | JP20080254823 | 30.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008254823 | [2011/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010038793 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330076 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01J63/06, H01J63/02, H01J1/30 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
B82Y40/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/15 (KR);
C09K11/65 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01B32/166 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T428/24174 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24479 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2457 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24612 (EP,US);
Y10T428/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/23] | C01B31/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/23] | Title | German: | VERBUNDSUBSTRAT AUS EINEM NANOCARBON-MATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/23] | English: | NANO-CARBON MATERIAL COMPOSITE SUBSTRATE AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2011/23] | French: | SUBSTRAT COMPOSITE DE MATÉRIAU DE NANOCARBONE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELUI-CI | [2011/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2011 | Translation filed | 28.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/23] | 10.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003297222 (JAPAN FINE CERAMICS CT) [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] - [0017] - [0038] - [0048]; figures 1-7,11-13 *[I] 2; | [X]JP2006055698 (NIKON CORP) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0042]; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]US2007018552 (CHO YOUNG-SUK [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] , [0042] - [0061]; figures 2-4; claim 2 * | International search | [X]JP2006147801 (SEIKO PRECISION KK, et al); | [X]JP2006143496 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2007314387 (FUJITSU LTD, et al); | [XP]JP2009032819 (FUJITSU LTD); | [XP]WO2009031344 (NEC CORP [JP], et al); | [XP]WO2009054461 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2002255519 | JP2002285334 | JP2003012312 | JP2003272517 |