EP2345690 - OPTICAL FILM AND METHOD OF PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANG, Byoung-Il 2-101 LG Chemistry Dormitory Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Chang-Hun 102-302 Daerim Durae Apt. 152-1 Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-805 / KR | 03 /
YOO, Jung-A 7-404 LG partner Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | 04 /
OH, Song-Taek 401-501 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | [2014/38] |
Former [2011/29] | 01 /
KANG, Byoung-Il 2-101 LG Chemistry Dormitory Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | ||
02 /
HAN, Chang-Hun 102-302 Daerim Durae Apt. 152-1 Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-805 / KR | |||
03 /
YOO, Jung-A 7-404 LG partner Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-340 / KR | |||
04 /
OH, Song-Taek 401-501 Expo Apt. Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-762 / KR | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09818005.2 | 01.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009KR05632 | Priority number, date | KR20080097400 | 02.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080097400 | [2011/29] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010038995 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2345690 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2345690 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, G02B5/30, G02F1/13363 | [2014/22] | CPC: |
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L33/08 (KR,US);
C08L53/02 (KR);
G02F1/13363 (EP,US);
C08J2333/10 (EP,US);
C08J2333/12 (EP,US);
G02F1/133311 (EP,US);
G02F1/133635 (EP,US);
G02F2201/50 (EP,US);
Y10S525/902 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31721 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31931 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/29] | C08J5/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE FOLIE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2011/29] | English: | OPTICAL FILM AND METHOD OF PREPARING SAME | [2011/29] | French: | FILM OPTIQUE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2011 | Translation filed | 27.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 28.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11003751.2 / EP2415825 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2009 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | IE | 01.10.2014 | LU | 01.10.2014 | BE | 31.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
LU | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 01.10.2009 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 01.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.10.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1754752 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0045] - [0053] - [0082] - [0084] - [0138] , [0140]; example -; claim - *; | [AP]WO2009038342 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR], et al) [AP] 1-13 * paragraphs [0034] - [0036]; example -; claim - * | International search | [A]KR20050106716 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR100604735B (SKC CO., LTD.); | [A]KR100624307B (CHEIL INDUSTRIES INC.); | [A]JP2007254726 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) | by applicant | KR20080097400 |