EP2340258 - METHODS FOR SYNTHESIS AND USES OF INHIBITORS OF GHRELIN O-ACYLTRANSFERASE AS POTENTIAL THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR OBESITY AND DIABETES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | [2011/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Philip A. 725 North Wolfe Street Baltimore Maryland 21205 / US | 02 /
BARNETT, Bradley P. 725 North Wolfe Street Baltimore Maryland 21205 / US | 03 /
HWANG, Yousang 725 North Wolfe Street Baltimore Maryland 21205 / US | 04 /
BOEKE, Jef D. 733 North Broadway Baltimore Maryland 21205 / US | [2011/27] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2011/27] | von Kreisler, Alek Von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 09818229.8 | 18.09.2009 | [2011/27] | WO2009US57512 | Priority number, date | US20080102549P | 03.10.2008 Original published format: US 102549 P | [2011/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010039461 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2340258 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/00, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61P3/10, A61K47/48 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/60 (EP,US);
A61K47/645 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/27] | C07K7/00, A61K38/08, A61K38/10, A61P3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SYNTHESE UND ANWENDUNGEN VON INHIBITOREN VON GHRELIN-O-ACYLTRANSFERASE ALS POTENTIELLE THERAPEUTISCHE MITTEL GEGEN OBESITAS UND DIABETES | [2011/27] | English: | METHODS FOR SYNTHESIS AND USES OF INHIBITORS OF GHRELIN O-ACYLTRANSFERASE AS POTENTIAL THERAPEUTIC AGENTS FOR OBESITY AND DIABETES | [2011/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE SYNTHÈSE ET D'UTILISATION D'INHIBITEURS DE LA GRHÉLINE O-ACYLTRANSFÉRASE COMME AGENTS THÉRAPEUTIQUES POTENTIELS POUR TRAITER L'OBÉSITÉ ET LE DIABÈTE | [2011/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/27] | 16.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2011 | 30.09.2013 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2007041278 (SOD CONSEILS RECH APPLIC [FR], et al) [I] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [I] - JING YANG ET AL, "Inhibition of ghrelin O-acyltransferase (GOAT) by octanoylated pentapeptides", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, vol. 105, no. 31, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0805353105, ISSN 0027-8424, (20080805), pages 10750 - 10755, (20080731), XP008145947 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * * page 10753; figure 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0805353105 | [T] - B. P. BARNETT ET AL, "Glucose and Weight Control in Mice with a Designed Ghrelin O-Acyltransferase Inhibitor", SCIENCE, (20101217), vol. 330, no. 6011, doi:10.1126/science.1196154, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1689 - 1692, XP055048732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1196154 | International search | [T]US2010086955 (HARRAN PATRCIK G [US], et al); | [A] - MASAYASU KOJIMA ET AL., "Ghrelin: Structure and Function", PHYSIOLGICAL REVIEWS, (2005), vol. 85, pages 495 - 522, XP002453764 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/physrev.00012.2004 | [A] - JING YANG ET AL., "Inhibition of ghrelin 0-acyltransferase (GOAT) by octanoylated pentapeptides", PNAS, (20080805), vol. 105, no. 31, pages 10750 - 10755, XP008145947 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0805353105 | [A] - ORESTEN GUALILLO ET AL., "Introducing GOAT: a target for obesity and anti- diabetic drugs?", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20080706), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 398 - 401, XP027070052 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tips.2008.06.003 | [A] - COMMERCIAL CATALOG OF PHOENIX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., (2010), URL: http://www.phoenixpeptide.com/catalog/pnxfoget.php?id=pnxnews_000000635&title=Compound&sum=Function, XP008145948 |