EP2347168 - FLASHLIGHT AND ILLUMINATED REAR SECTION WITH TWO-SIDED LIGHTING MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Life+Gear, Inc. 742 Genevieve Street, Suite O Solana Beach, CA 92075 / US | [2011/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTKEN, Dennis 742 Genevieve Street Suite O Solana Beach CA 92075 / US | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Wilding, Frances Ward Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09818595.2 | 02.10.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009US59443 | Priority number, date | US20080102338P | 02.10.2008 Original published format: US 102338 P | [2011/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010040102 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2347168 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F21L4/02, // F21Y101/02 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
F21L4/022 (EP,US);
F21L4/02 (KR,US);
F21L14/02 (KR);
F21L4/027 (EP,US);
F21V33/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | F21L4/02, F21L14/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | TASCHENLAMPE UND BELEUCHTETES RÜCKTEIL MIT ZWEISEITIGEM BELEUCHTUNGSMODUL | [2011/30] | English: | FLASHLIGHT AND ILLUMINATED REAR SECTION WITH TWO-SIDED LIGHTING MODULE | [2011/30] | French: | LAMPE TORCHE ET SECTION ARRIÈRE ÉCLAIRÉE AVEC MODULE D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DOUBLE FACE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 02.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 22.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1811226 (WORLDS APART LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,7,8,10,13 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0032] * * figure 4 * [Y] 11 [I] 3,6,14; | [XI]US2007019398 (CHEN CHENG-HSI [TW], et al) [X] 1,4,5 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 1-3 * [I] 2,3,6,10,13,14; | [X]US6231207 (KENNEDY DOUGLAS B [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 5 * * column 5, line 13 - line 29 * * figures 5, 6, 8, 9 *; | [YA]US5545069 (GLYNN KENNETH P [US], et al) [Y] 11 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 15 * * figures 5, 6 * [A] 9,12; | [A]US2005201092 (CHEN CHING-CHUNG [TW]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0024] * * figure 2 *; | [A]US6280051 (WALLACH STEWART [US]) [A] 1,10,11 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002149928 (WATTERSON SCOTT R [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1, 4 * | International search | [A]US5412548 (YEE VINCENT M [US]); | [A]EP0746718 (EVEREADY AUSTRALIA PTY LTD [AU]); | [A]US2002196622 (KLEES GARRY W [US]); | [A]US2007153512 (HENDRIE PIERS [US]) |