EP2348760 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUBAREA SERVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. B1-3A Intellectual Property Department Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. B1-3A Intellectual Property Dept. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Wen Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Wenhu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2011/30] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/30] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09818666.1 | 16.11.2009 | [2011/30] | WO2009CN74927 | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011057445 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2348760 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, // H04W4/02 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
H04W48/20 (EP);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/8033 (EP);
H04M15/83 (EP);
H04M15/835 (EP);
H04M15/8353 (EP);
H04M15/84 (EP);
H04M15/844 (EP);
H04M15/85 (EP);
H04M15/851 (EP);
H04M15/86 (EP);
H04M15/863 (EP);
H04W4/24 (EP);
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W4/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/30] | H04W4/02, H04W4/24 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG ENES TEILBEREICHSDIENSTES | [2011/30] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUBAREA SERVICE | [2011/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF DE MISE EN OEUVRE DE SERVICE DE SOUS-ZONE | [2011/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2010 | Translation filed | 14.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.04.2010 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 13.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 23.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO0018156 (TELIA AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,13,15 * abstract * * page 7, line 15 - line 28 * * page 8, line 5 - line 14 * * page 10, line 12 - page 11, line 12 * [Y] 5-7,9,14 [I] 2-4,12; | [X]WO2009077332 (GEMALTO SA [FR], et al) [X] 1,8,10,11,13,15 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 15 *; | [Y] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Specification of the SIM Application Toolkit for the Subscriber Identity Module - Mobile Equipment (SIM - ME) interface (Release 1999)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 11.14, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V8.18.0, pages 1 - 156, XP050359938 [Y] 5-7,9,14 * page 19 - page 20 * * pages 44,45,48 * * pages 101,102 * * pages 119,121 * | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Terminals Specification of the Subscriber Identity Module - Mobile Equipment (SIM - ME) interface (Release 1999)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 11.11, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20070601), no. V8.14.0, pages 1 - 178, XP050359891 [A] 1-15 * page 86 - page 92 * | International search | [A]CN1464757 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN101340717 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP JIANGSU COM [CN]); | [A]CN101404795 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP JIANGSU COM [CN]); | [X]CN101466087 (NINGBO SAGEM BIRD RES AND DEV [CN]) |