EP2351746 - THE 1-BUTYL-2-HYDROXYARALKYL PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THE USES AS ANTI-DEPRESSION MEDICINE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSPC Zhongqi Pharmaceutical Technology (Shijiazhuang) Co., Ltd. No. 226 Huanghe Street Shijiazhuang Hebei 050035 / CN | For all designated states Shanghai Institute of Pharmaceutical Industry No. 1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | [2014/39] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states CSPC Zhongqi Pharmaceutical Technology (Shijiazhuang) Co., Ltd. No. 276 Zhongshan West Road Shijiazhuang Hebei 050051 / CN | ||
For all designated states Shanghai Institute of Pharmaceutical Industry No. 1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Jianqi No.1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | 02 /
LV, Na No.1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | 03 /
JIN, Hua No.1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | 04 /
WENG, Zhijie No.1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | 05 /
ZHENG, Yongyong No.1320 Beijing West Road Shanghai 200040 / CN | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2012/34] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2011/31] | Eisenführ, Günther, et al Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09818779.2 | 29.09.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009CN74314 | Priority number, date | CN2008143821 | 07.10.2008 Original published format: CN200810043821 | [2011/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010040315 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2351746 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2351746 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/084, A61K31/495, A61P25/24 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US);
C07D295/084 (KR);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07D295/088 (EP,US);
C07D295/092 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | 1-BUTYL-2-HYDROXYARALKYL-PIPERAZIN-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ANTIDEPRESSIVA | [2011/31] | English: | THE 1-BUTYL-2-HYDROXYARALKYL PIPERAZINE DERIVATIVES AND THE USES AS ANTI-DEPRESSION MEDICINE THEREOF | [2011/31] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE LA 1-BUTYL-2-HYDROXYARALKYLPIPÉRAZINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS COMME MÉDICAMENT ANTIDÉPRESSEUR | [2014/20] |
Former [2011/31] | DÉRIVÉS DE 1-BUTYL-2-HYDROXYARALKYLPIPÉRAZINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS COMME MÉDICAMENT ANTIDÉPRESSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2011 | Translation filed | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CN | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 02.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 13.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.09.2009 | AT | 12.11.2014 | BE | 12.11.2014 | BG | 12.11.2014 | CY | 12.11.2014 | CZ | 12.11.2014 | DK | 12.11.2014 | EE | 12.11.2014 | ES | 12.11.2014 | FI | 12.11.2014 | HR | 12.11.2014 | IT | 12.11.2014 | LT | 12.11.2014 | LV | 12.11.2014 | MC | 12.11.2014 | MK | 12.11.2014 | MT | 12.11.2014 | NL | 12.11.2014 | PL | 12.11.2014 | RO | 12.11.2014 | SE | 12.11.2014 | SI | 12.11.2014 | SK | 12.11.2014 | SM | 12.11.2014 | TR | 12.11.2014 | NO | 12.02.2015 | GR | 13.02.2015 | IS | 12.03.2015 | PT | 12.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/46] | HU | 29.09.2009 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BE | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 29.09.2009 | |
AT | 12.11.2014 | ||
BG | 12.11.2014 | ||
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
SM | 12.11.2014 | ||
TR | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
MT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
MC | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SI | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
IT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
SK | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
RO | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
EE | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
DK | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
CY | 12.11.2014 | ||
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 12.11.2014 | |
ES | 12.11.2014 | ||
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
HR | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
LV | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
PL | 12.11.2014 | ||
SE | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
GR | 13.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 12.11.2014 | |
FI | 12.11.2014 | ||
LT | 12.11.2014 | ||
NL | 12.11.2014 | ||
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
IS | 12.03.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
PT | 12.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 12.11.2014 | |
NO | 12.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 12.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005267121 (LI JIANQI [CN], et al) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * clims ** page 3 - page 4 * | International search | [A]CN1381448 (SHANGHAI ACADEMY OF MEDICAL IN [CN]); | [A]CN1384102 (SHANGHAI INST OF MEDICINAL IND [CN]); | [A]CN1948297 (SHANGHAI INST OF MEDICINE INDU [CN]) | by applicant | US4748726 | - ZHANG JUNTIAN, Modern Pharmacological Experiments Mothods, BEIJING MEDICAL UNIVERSITY AND PEKING UNION MEDICAL UNIVERSITY JOINT PUBLISHING HOUSE, (1998), pages 1064 - 1066 | - ZHANG JUNTIAN, Modern Pharmacological Experiments Mothods, BEIJING MEDICAL UNIVERSITY AND PEKING UNION MEDICAL UNIVERSITY JOINT PUBLISHING HOUSE, (1998), pages 1818 - 1821 | CN20021011934 | CN20051030354 |