EP2343182 - TIRE MOLDING DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYOFUKU, Masanobu c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | [2015/05] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
TOYOFUKU, Masanobu c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION Technical Center 3-1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-8531 / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2014/30] | Oxley, Robin John George, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2012/49] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2011/28] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09819116.6 | 30.09.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009JP67087 | Priority number, date | JP20080262170 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008262170 | [2011/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010041581 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343182 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343182 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B29D30/26, B29D30/32 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
B29D30/32 (EP,US);
B29D30/26 (EP,US);
B29D2030/2614 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3228 (EP,US);
B29D2030/3235 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/28] | B29D30/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REIFENFORMTROMMEL | [2011/28] | English: | TIRE MOLDING DRUM | [2011/28] | French: | TAMBOUR DE MOULAGE DE PNEUMATIQUE | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2011 | Translation filed | 21.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 21.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 16.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.09.2009 | AT | 28.01.2015 | BE | 28.01.2015 | CY | 28.01.2015 | CZ | 28.01.2015 | DK | 28.01.2015 | EE | 28.01.2015 | ES | 28.01.2015 | FI | 28.01.2015 | HR | 28.01.2015 | IT | 28.01.2015 | LT | 28.01.2015 | LV | 28.01.2015 | MC | 28.01.2015 | MK | 28.01.2015 | MT | 28.01.2015 | NL | 28.01.2015 | PL | 28.01.2015 | PT | 28.01.2015 | RO | 28.01.2015 | SE | 28.01.2015 | SI | 28.01.2015 | SK | 28.01.2015 | SM | 28.01.2015 | TR | 28.01.2015 | BG | 28.04.2015 | NO | 28.04.2015 | GR | 29.04.2015 | IS | 28.05.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | GB | 30.09.2015 | IE | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | LU | 30.09.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MK | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.09.2009 | |
AT | 28.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CY | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
SM | 28.01.2015 | ||
TR | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
MT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
GB | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
IE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
MC | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SI | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
IT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
CZ | 28.01.2015 | ||
DK | 28.01.2015 | ||
EE | 28.01.2015 | ||
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
RO | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
SK | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
LV | 28.01.2015 | ||
NL | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 28.01.2015 | |
ES | 28.01.2015 | ||
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
IS | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
PL | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
GR | 29.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
FI | 28.01.2015 | ||
HR | 28.01.2015 | ||
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
SE | 28.01.2015 | ||
BG | 28.04.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 28.01.2015 | |
LT | 28.01.2015 | ||
NO | 28.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 28.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006033119 (PIRELLI [IT], et al) [X] 1 * page 28, line 13 - page 29, line 8; figures 3a,4a,7; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1182028 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure -; claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2000079616 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | [Y]JP2000135745 (BRIDGESTONE CORP); | [Y]JP2006007654 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) |