EP2343277 - NOVEL COMPOUND AND ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2011/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Dae-Woong 108-502, Hanbat Woosung Apt. Munhwa-dong Jung-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 301-130 / KR | 02 /
HONG, Sung-Kil 3-207, LG partner Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 305-340 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Tae-Yoon 408-1402 Techno Valley Ssangyong Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 305-509 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Yeon-Hwan 610-1801, Mokdong 6-danji Apt. Mok 6-dong Yangchen-gu Seoul 158-756 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Seong-So 511-902, Dongmun Green City Apt. Jori-eup Paju-si Gyeonggi-do 413-738 / KR | [2014/03] |
Former [2011/28] | 01 /
LEE, Dae-Woong 108-502, Hanbat Woosung Apt. Munhwa-dong Jung-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 301-130 / KR | ||
02 /
HONG, Sung-Kil 3-207, LG partner Apt. Doryong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 305-340 / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Tae-Yoon 408-1402 Techno Valley Ssangyong Apt. Gwanpyeong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon Metropolitan City 305-509 / KR | |||
04 /
KIM, Yeon-Hwan 610-1801, Mokdong 6-danji Apt. Mok 6-dong Yangchen-gu Seoul 158-756 / KR | |||
05 /
KIM, Seong-So 511-902, Dongmun Green City Apt. Jori-eup Paju-si Gyeonggi-do 413-738 / KR | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/28] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09819379.0 | 08.10.2009 | [2011/28] | WO2009KR05736 | Priority number, date | KR20080098493 | 08.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080098493 | [2011/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010041872 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | KO | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2343277 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2343277 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/82, C09K11/06, H01L51/54 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
C07D209/82 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/06 (KR);
C07D209/88 (CN);
H10K50/00 (KR);
H10K85/626 (EP,CN,US);
H10K85/633 (EP,CN,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUE VERBINDUNG UND DIESE VERWENDENDE ORGANISCHE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2011/28] | English: | NOVEL COMPOUND AND ORGANIC ELECTRONIC DEVICE USING SAME | [2011/28] | French: | NOUVEAU COMPOSÉ ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ORGANIQUE L'UTILISANT | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2011 | Translation filed | 08.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 08.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 10.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2009 | AT | 15.01.2014 | BE | 15.01.2014 | BG | 15.01.2014 | CY | 15.01.2014 | CZ | 15.01.2014 | DK | 15.01.2014 | EE | 15.01.2014 | ES | 15.01.2014 | FI | 15.01.2014 | HR | 15.01.2014 | IT | 15.01.2014 | LT | 15.01.2014 | LV | 15.01.2014 | MC | 15.01.2014 | MK | 15.01.2014 | MT | 15.01.2014 | NL | 15.01.2014 | PL | 15.01.2014 | RO | 15.01.2014 | SE | 15.01.2014 | SI | 15.01.2014 | SK | 15.01.2014 | SM | 15.01.2014 | TR | 15.01.2014 | NO | 15.04.2014 | GR | 16.04.2014 | IS | 15.05.2014 | PT | 15.05.2014 | IE | 08.10.2014 | LU | 08.10.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
MT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
AT | 15.01.2014 | ||
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
TR | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
IT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
BG | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
GR | 16.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
SM | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
IE | 08.10.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
MC | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
LU | 08.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SI | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
PL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
SK | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
RO | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 15.01.2014 | ||
DK | 15.01.2014 | ||
EE | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
BE | 15.01.2014 | ||
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
HR | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
LV | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
NL | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 15.01.2014 | |
CY | 15.01.2014 | ||
ES | 15.01.2014 | ||
FI | 15.01.2014 | ||
LT | 15.01.2014 | ||
SE | 15.01.2014 | ||
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | ||
PT | 15.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 15.01.2014 | |
NO | 15.04.2014 | ||
IS | 15.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [IP]EP1985613 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [XPI]WO2009035295 (CHEIL IND INC [KR], et al); | [XPA]WO2009035296 (CHEIL IND INC [KR], et al); | International search | [X]KR100573137B ; | [A]KR100822212B (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR100846590B ; | [X]KR20080067165 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) |