EP2330911 - NATURAL PRESERVATIVE ALTERNATIVES COMPRISING LONICERA EXTRACT AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/24] | NATURAL PRESERVATIVE ALTERNATIVES AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Woodcliff Skincare Solutions, Inc. 330 Grant Street, Suite 905 Pittsburgh, PA 15219 / US | [2013/46] |
Former [2011/24] | For all designated states Aloebiotics Research Labs, Inc. 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, NY 10016 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBAUN, Denise 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | 02 /
HOYLE, Rose 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | 03 /
WEINSTEIN, Shirley 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
DEBAUN, Denise 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | ||
02 /
HOYLE, Rose 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | |||
03 /
WEINSTEIN, Shirley 303 Fifth Avenue Suite 1007 New York, New York 10016 / US | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/24] | Sexton, Jane Helen, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09819686.8 | 02.10.2009 | [2014/44] | WO2009US59344 | Priority number, date | US20080195316P | 06.10.2008 Original published format: US 195316 P | [2011/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010042399 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2330911 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2330911 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A01N31/02, A61Q17/00, A61Q19/00, A61K8/97, A61K31/74, A61K36/355, A61Q19/08, A01N65/00 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61K36/355 (EP,US);
A01N31/02 (EP,US);
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
A01N65/08 (EP,US);
A61K31/74 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61K8/9794 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A01N31/02, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N31/02, A01N31/02, A01N35/06 (EP,US);
A01N65/00, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N65/08, A01N31/02, A01N35/06, A01N43/08, A01N57/12 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2012/30] | A01N65/00, A61K31/74, A61Q19/08, A61K36/355, A61K8/97 | ||
Former IPC [2011/24] | A01N65/00, A61K31/74, A61K36/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NATÜRLICHE KONSERVIERUNGSALTERNATIVEN ENTHALTEND LONICER EXTRAKT UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | [2014/44] | English: | NATURAL PRESERVATIVE ALTERNATIVES COMPRISING LONICERA EXTRACT AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME | [2014/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS CONSERVATEURS ALTERNATIFS NATURELS COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE LONICERA, ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT | [2014/44] |
Former [2011/24] | NATÜRLICHE KONSERVIERUNGSALTERNATIVEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT | ||
Former [2011/24] | NATURAL PRESERVATIVE ALTERNATIVES AND COMPOSITIONS CONTAINING SAME | ||
Former [2011/24] | ALTERNATIVES DE CONSERVATION NATURELLE ET COMPOSITIONS LES CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 01.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/24] | 06.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP14162839.6 / EP2752116 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.10.2009 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BE | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | ES | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | IT | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/45] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BE | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 02.10.2009 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
ES | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR20070080707 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - ANTHONY C DWECK, "Natural Preservatives", ISSN 1358-2453, (20030801), pages 1 - 8, COSMETICS AND TOILETRIES MANUFACTURE WORLDWIDE, BUSHEY HEATH, GB, URL: http://www.dweckdata.com/Published_papers/Natural_Preservative.pdf, XP008150125 [Y] 1-3,6-15 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2006018867 (KAWASAKI YUJI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2004213748 (CHUAH BENG SIM [MY], et al); | [Y]US2007134284 (PARKER DIANA L [CA]); | [Y]US2005271595 (BROWN JAMES S [US]) | by applicant | US5037843 | US5965594 |