EP2350674 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SORTING SPECIMEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quest Diagnostics Investments Incorporated 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | [2022/18] |
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Quest Diagnostics Investments Incorporated 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAVI, Leroy Sina 28188 Moulton Parkway 527 Laguna Niguel California 92677 / US | 02 /
RUIJS, Erwin Nicolaas Marinus Petrus 25071 Camino Del Mar, Unit F Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | [2011/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/18] |
Former [2018/27] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | ||
Former [2011/31] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09819882.3 | 08.10.2009 | [2011/31] | WO2009US60006 | Priority number, date | US20080249819 | 10.10.2008 Original published format: US 249819 | [2011/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010042722 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350674 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350674 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2350674 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N35/04, B07C5/34 | [2012/22] | CPC: |
B07C5/3412 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/31] | G01N35/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR SORTIERUNG VON PROBEN | [2011/31] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR SORTING SPECIMEN | [2011/31] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRI D'ÉCHANTILLONS | [2011/31] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 28.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18174134.9 / EP3438672 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.04.2019
ADMISSIBLE Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2019/19] | 16.04.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.08.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 02.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.10.2020 | 15.10.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 20.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.10.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.12.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.03.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 17.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1633/21 | 17.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 28.10.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 28.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.10.2009 | AT | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | DK | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | ES | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | IT | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | NL | 04.07.2018 | PL | 04.07.2018 | PT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IE | 08.10.2018 | LU | 08.10.2018 | MT | 08.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 08.10.2009 | |
AT | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
MT | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IE | 08.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
LU | 08.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
DK | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
IT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
ES | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
PL | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | |
NL | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 04.07.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5414974 (VAN DE VEN JOHN [US], et al); | [X]US2004049314 (SANSONE RONALD P [US]); | [X]WO2006110484 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008052040 (ALIGN TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US6329139 (NOVA MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [A]US2005250211 (REINHARDT KURT [US], et al); | [A]US2006134580 (RABY RICHARD E [US], et al); | [Y]US7070053 (ABRAMS ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2006213964 (EXCOFFIER JEAN-LOUIS [US], et al); | [Y]US7278328 (MASSARO PETER [US]); | [A]US2008198014 (VOGT ERIC E [US], et al) | Examination | US2004267403 | by applicant | US742353 | US4513522 | US4588880 | US4974166 | US5097421 | US5150795 | US5414974 | US2004094314 | WO2006110484 | US7308114 | WO2008052040 | Opposition | US4513522 | US4588880 | US4974166 | US5097421 | US5150795 | US5351801 | EP0633207 | US5414974 | US5614415 | EP0676053 | US5777303 | US5985670 | US6343690 | US2004049314 | US2004267403 | US2005036907 | US2006153455 | US2006187039 | WO2006110484 | US2006245865 | US2007254277 | WO2008052040 | EP2141500 | US7688207 | EP2225567 | US5445037 | EP0676053 | US5730276 | US2002062111 | US6520313 | US2003161764 | US2004136869 | US2005207945 | US2005247790 |