EP2344657 - MICROBIAL PROCESSING OF CELLULOSIC FEEDSTOCKS FOR FUEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Menon&Associates, Inc. 12282 Libelle Court San Diego, California 92131 / US | [2011/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENON, Suresh M. 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 02 /
NEWMAN, David E. 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 03 /
SIRCAR, Jagadish Chandra 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 04 /
ALISALA, Kashinatham 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 05 /
YANG, Kay A. 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 06 /
ORCHARD, Samantha 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | 07 /
GUIDI, Sara 12282 Libelle Court San Diego California 92131 / US | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Duffy, Assumpta Dympna, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2011/29] | Coyle, Philip Aidan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 09819946.6 | 09.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US60169 | Priority number, date | US20080136860P | 09.10.2008 Original published format: US 136860 P | US20090202288P | 13.02.2009 Original published format: US 202288 P | US20090213906P | 28.07.2009 Original published format: US 213906 P | US20090573732 | 05.10.2009 Original published format: US 573732 | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010042819 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2344657 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 22.07.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64, C12M1/33 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
C12N1/22 (EP,US);
C12P7/6409 (US);
C11B3/003 (US);
C12N1/32 (EP,US);
C12P5/005 (EP,US);
C12P5/02 (EP,US);
C12P7/6418 (EP,US);
C12P7/6427 (EP,US);
C12P7/6431 (EP,US);
C12P7/6458 (EP,US);
C12P7/6463 (EP,US);
C12P7/649 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/29] | Title | German: | MIKROBIELLE VERARBEITUNG VON ZELLULOSE-ROHMATERIALIEN FÜR EINEN BRENNSTOFF | [2011/29] | English: | MICROBIAL PROCESSING OF CELLULOSIC FEEDSTOCKS FOR FUEL | [2011/29] | French: | TRANSFORMATION MICROBIENNE DE MATIÈRES PREMIÈRES CELLULOSIQUES EN CARBURANT | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 07.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 13.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0207475 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [A]US2007161095 (GURIN MICHAEL H [US]); | [A]US2008057555 (NGUYEN XUAN NGHINH [US]); | [Y]US2008086938 (HAZLEBECK DAVID A [US], et al); | [A]US2008086939 (DUNLOP ERIC H [AU], et al); | [A]US2008124446 (MARKELS MICHAEL [US]); | [X]US2008160593 (OYLER JAMES R [US]); |