EP2344632 - METHOD FOR INDUCING PLURIPOTENCY IN CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.11.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2022/52] | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
For all designated states Bamdad, Cynthia 356 Marlborough, Unit 2 Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
Former [2011/29] | For all designated states Minerva Biotechnologies Corporation 40 Bear Hill Rd. Waltham, MA 02451 / US | ||
For all designated states Bamdad, Cynthia C. 356 Marlborough, Unit 2 Boston, Massachusetts 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAMDAD, Cynthia 356 Marlborough, Unit 2 Boston, MA 02115 / US | 02 /
FESSLER, Shawn 6 Twin Circle Drive Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2011/29] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/52] |
Former [2011/29] | Cowley, Catherine Mary, et al Venner Shipley LLP, 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09820001.7 | 09.10.2009 | [2011/29] | WO2009US60272 | Priority number, date | US20080104231P | 09.10.2008 Original published format: US 104231 P | [2011/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010042891 | Date: | 15.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2344632 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2344632 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2012 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/48, C12N5/071 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
C12N5/0606 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
C12N5/00 (KR);
C12N5/0696 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/40 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/50 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/602 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2501/603 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/32] | A61K38/48 | ||
Former IPC [2011/29] | C12N5/071, C12N5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/52] |
Former [2011/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERBEIFÜHRUNG VON PLURIPOTENZEN IN ZELLEN | [2011/29] | English: | METHOD FOR INDUCING PLURIPOTENCY IN CELLS | [2011/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'INDUIRE UNE PLURIPOTENCE DANS DES CELLULES | [2011/29] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/29] | 02.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2018 | Observations by third parties | 28.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22209455.9 / EP4201421 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/49] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.01.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.02.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.07.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 18.07.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.07.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.04.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.05.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.11.2012 | 31.10.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.2022 | CZ | 28.12.2022 | DK | 28.12.2022 | EE | 28.12.2022 | ES | 28.12.2022 | FI | 28.12.2022 | HR | 28.12.2022 | LT | 28.12.2022 | LV | 28.12.2022 | MC | 28.12.2022 | PL | 28.12.2022 | RO | 28.12.2022 | SE | 28.12.2022 | SI | 28.12.2022 | SK | 28.12.2022 | SM | 28.12.2022 | NO | 28.03.2023 | GR | 29.03.2023 | IS | 28.04.2023 | PT | 28.04.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SI | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
DK | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
IS | 28.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
PL | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SK | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 28.12.2022 | |
CZ | 28.12.2022 | ||
EE | 28.12.2022 | ||
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
RO | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | EE | 28.12.2022 | |
ES | 28.12.2022 | ||
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
PT | 28.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 28.12.2022 | |
FI | 28.12.2022 | ||
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
SM | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
HR | 28.12.2022 | ||
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
LV | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
GR | 29.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | FI | 28.12.2022 | |
LT | 28.12.2022 | ||
SE | 28.12.2022 | ||
NO | 28.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 28.12.2022 | |
NO | 28.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006105448 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * claims 1,5-16 *; | [E]WO2010042562 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2010144887 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [X] - HIKITA SHERRY T ET AL, "MUC1* mediates the growth of human pluripotent stem cells", PLOS ONE, PUBLIC LIBRARY OF SCIENCE, US, (20081003), vol. 3, no. 10, doi:10.1371/JOURNAL.PONE.0003312, ISSN 1932-6203, page E3312, XP002560322 [X] 1-5,7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0003312 | [T] - BENOIT J. SMAGGHE ET AL, "MUC1* Ligand, NM23-H1, Is a Novel Growth Factor That Maintains Human Stem Cells in a More Naïve State", PLOS ONE, (20130307), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0058601, page e58601, XP055058843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0058601 | International search | [X]US2006222637 (BAMDAD CYNTHIA C [US]); | [Y]WO2008070171 (MINERVA BIOTECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al); | [Y] - THATHIAH A ET AL., "Tumor Necrosis factor-alpha Converting Enzyme/ADAM 17 Mediates MUC1 Shedding", J. BIOL. CHEM., (20030131), vol. 278, pages 3386 - 3394, XP003006375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M208326200 | [Y] - BOYER LAURIE A ET AL., "Core transcriptional regulatory circuitry in human embryonic stem cells", (20050923), vol. 122, pages 947 - 956, XP002412923 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2005.08.020 | by applicant | - AOI, T. et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 321, pages 699 - 702 | - BOYER L. A. et al., Cell, (20050000), vol. 122, pages 947 - 956 | - DEXHEIMER, Mol Cancer Ther, (20090000), vol. 8, pages 1363 - 1377 | - FESSLER S. et al., Cancer Res Treat. May, (20090000), vol. 5 | - FOSTER, K. W. et al., Oncogene, (20050000), vol. 24, pages 1491 - 1500 | - HIKITA et al., PLoS ONE, (20080000), vol. 3, page e3312 | - HUANG, L. et al., Cancer Res., (20050000), vol. 65, no. 22, pages 10413 - 22 | - HUANGFU D. et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 795 - 797 | - HUANGFU D. et al., Nat Biotechnol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 1269 - 1275 | - JAENISCH, R.; YOUNG, R., Cell, (20080000), vol. 132, pages 567 - 582 | - KAJI K. et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 458, pages 771 - 775 | - KAWAMURA et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 460, no. 7259, pages 1140 - 4 | - KIM et al., Biochem Biophys Res Commun, (20030000), vol. 307, pages 281 - 289 | - KOMAROV et al., Science, (19990000), vol. 285, no. 5434, pages 1733 - 7 | - LIN T et al., Nat Cell Biol, (20050000), vol. 7, pages 165 - 171 | - LOWRY, W.E. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20080000), vol. 105, pages 2883 - 2888 | - LYSSIOTIS et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20090000), vol. 106, pages 8912 - 8917 | - MAHANTA et al., PLoS ONE, (20080000), vol. 3, page e2054 | - MAHERALI, N. et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20070000), vol. 1, pages 55 - 70 | - MAIMTES T et al., Oncogene, (20080000), vol. 27, pages 5277 - 5287 | - NAKAGAWA, M. et al., Nature Biotechnol, (20080000), vol. 26, pages 101 - 106 | - OKITA, K et al., Nature, (20070000), vol. 448, pages 313 - 317 | - OKITA K et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 322, pages 949 - 953 | - PARK, I.H. et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 451, pages 141 - 146 | - RAINA et al., Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 69, pages 5133 - 5141 | - SOLDNER F. et al., Cell, (20090000), vol. 136, pages 964 - 977 | - SOMMER C A et al., Stem Cells, (20090000), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 543 - 9 | - STADTFELD M. et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 322, pages 945 - 949 | - STROM et al., Nat Chem Biol., (20060000), vol. 2, no. 9, pages 474 - 9 | - TAKAHASHI, K.; YAMANAKA, S., Cell, (20060000), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - TAKAHASHI, K. et al., Cell, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - THATHIAH, A et al., J Biol Chem, (20030000), vol. 274, pages 3386 - 3394 | - VASSILEV L. T. et al., Science, (20040000), vol. 303, pages 844 - 848 | - WEI et al., Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 67, pages 1853 - 1858 | - WERNIG, M. et al., Nature, (20070000), vol. 448, pages 318 - 324 | - WERNIG M. et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20080000), vol. 2, pages 10 - 12 | - WOLTJEN K. et al., Nature, (20090000), vol. 458, pages 766 - 770 | - YAMANAKA, S., Cell stem Cells, (20070000), vol. 1, pages 39 - 49 | - YU J. et al., Science, (20090000), vol. 324, pages 797 - 801 | - YU, J. et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1917 - 1920 | - ZHOU et al., MCB, (20000000), vol. 20, pages 628 - 633 | - ZHOU et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20090000), vol. 4, pages 381 - 384 |